THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:06-cv-00904-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander John Pires, Jr. +1 202 331 7050 +1 202 338 3635 dianecooley@comcast.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael D. Thorp +1 202 305 0456 michael.thorp@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/27/2006
Jury Demand None
Demand $60000000
Nature of Suit 504 - Native American
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO EXTEND THE TEMPORARY STAY, filed by THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION, USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Michael)
    LREF
    Legal Document 23 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER Continuing the STAY in the CASE, STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 9/3/2008 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
      LREF
      Legal Document 22 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT and Motion To Extend Stay, filed by THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION, USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Michael)
        LREF
        Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/7/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Court Filing
        STATUS REPORT ORDER Status Report due by 8/4/2008 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
          LREF
          Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT AND MOTION TO EXTEND STAY, filed by THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION, USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Michael)
            LREF
            Legal Document 19 Filed: 6/4/2008, Entered: 6/4/2008 Court Filing
            STATUS REPORT ORDER and all proceedings remain suspended. Status Report due by 7/2/2008. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
              LREF
              Legal Document 18 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT And Motion To Extend Stay, filed by all parties. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Michael)
                LREF
                Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Court Filing
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Granting the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Temporary Stay of Litigation to and including June 2, 2008. Status Report due by 6/2/2008 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                  JOINT STATUS REPORT and motion to extend stay of litigation to June 2, 2008, filed by THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION, USA. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Thorp, Michael) Modified on 4/3/2008 to edit docket text. (Samler, Debbie).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael D. Thorp for USA. (Thorp, Michael)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                      *** Attorney Kevin James Larsen terminated. (dls)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008
                        NOTICE, filed by USA Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal and Substitution of Counsel (Larsen, Kevin)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/4/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [12] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time and the parties' joint motion to stay.Joint Status Report by 4/3/2008. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008, Terminated: 3/4/2008 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                            Joint MOTION for Leave to File Attached Parties' Second Joint Status Report and Third Motion for Temporary Stay of Litigation Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 3/20/2008. (Attachments: # (1)Proposed Order; # (2) Joint Status Report and Motion for Extension of Stay; # (3) Proposed Order)(Larsen, Kevin) Modified on 3/3/2008 to edit docket text to describe attachments.(Samler, Debbie).
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER STAYING CASEStatus Report due by 2/28/2008 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (TQ)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                              JOINT STATUS REPORT Parties' First Joint Status Report and Second Joint Motion for Temporary Extension of Litigation Stay, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1))(Larsen, Kevin)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: 2/23/2007 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [7] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 11/30/2007 Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (teq)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin James Larsen for USA. (Larsen, Kevin)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/20/2007, Entered: 2/20/2007, Terminated: 2/23/2007 Motion to Stay
                                    Joint MOTION to Stay Litigation, filed by USA.Response due by 3/9/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(Larsen, Kevin)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Court Filing
                                      NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Marian Blank Horn for all further ADR Pilot Program proceedings. Judge Christine O.C. Miller no longer assigned to the case. (mij, )
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/22/2007, Entered: 1/22/2007 Court Filing
                                        ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Judge Marian B. Horn as the ADR Pilot Program Judge. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (mp1, )
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mij, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Court Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine Odell Cook Miller for ADR Pilot proceedings. (mij, ) Modified on 12/29/2006 to correct ADR judge and attach new pdf. (dls ).
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006 Court Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush (mij, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/27/2006, Entered: 12/27/2006
                                                COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 065916), filed by THREE AFFILIATED TRIBES OF THE FORT BERTHOLD INDIAN RESERVATION.Answer due by 2/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(mij, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?