RAMSEY et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00021-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
No Logo SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Conway, Homer & Chin-Caplan, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Ronald Craig Homer +1 617 695 1990 +1 617 695 0880 rhomer@ccandh.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Althea Walker Davis +1 202 616 0515 +1 202 353 2988 althea.davis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/16/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 5/12/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (66) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
RESPONSE to PETITIONERS REPLY TO RESPONDENTS RESPONSE TO THE PETITIONERS APPLICATION FOR FEES AND COSTS, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. (Homer, Ronald)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
    NOTICE, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY Exhibits 18-20. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 18, # (2) Exhibit 19, # (3) Exhibit 20)(Homer, Ronald)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
      RESPONSE to [47] MOTION for Attorney Fees Petitioner's Application for Fees and Costs, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Reply due by 9/05/2008. (Davis, Althea)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent's response tp petitioner's motion for attorney's fees is due by 8/15/2008. Petitioner's reply is due by 9/5/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
          ORDER finding as moot [54] Petitioner's Motion for Extension of Time to file a response to Court's June 5, 2008 order. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008
            RESPONSE to PETITIONERS RESPONSE TO THE COURTS JUNE 5, 2008 ORDER AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. (Homer, Ronald)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008, Terminated: 7/10/2008 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 9, 2008 to TO RESPOND TO THE COURTS JUNE 5, 2008 ORDER, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY.Response due by 7/28/2008. (Homer, Ronald)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
                ORDER for more information on attorneys' fees. Response is due by 7/7/08. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/5/2008, Entered: 6/5/2008
                  NOTICE, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY Petitioner and Counsel Statement. (Homer, Ronald)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008
                    Amended MOTION for Attorney Fees, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Homer, Ronald)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                      Petitioner's Election to Accept [49] Judgment. (Homer, Ronald)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/12/2008
                        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $200,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner as legal representative of the Estate of Demarius Jamar Ramsey. (lld)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                          NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [46] DECISION of Special Master. (Homer, Ronald)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                            MOTION for Attorney Fees Petitioner's Application for Fees and Costs, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY.Response due by 5/27/2008. (Homer, Ronald)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008
                              DECISION of Special Master. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran.(Attachments: # (1) Appendix Appendix A)(fs)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
                                STIPULATION, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Davis, Althea)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008
                                  15-WEEK STIPULATION STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Davis, Althea)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008
                                    15-Week STIPULATION ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 4/23/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                      ORDER granting [41] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 1/7/2008 regarding settlement or expert report Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Telephonic status conference held on 12/06/2007 to discuss settlement. (tpj)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion to Stay
                                          MOTION to Stay Deadline for Expert Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Davis, Althea)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                                            MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #15 through 17] filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 15# (2) Errata 16# (3) Exhibit 17)(Homer, Ronald)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Althea Walker Davis for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.. (Davis, Althea)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                                *** Attorney Robin Lynn Brodrick terminated. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007
                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part [35] Motion for Extension of Time Expert Report due by 11/30/2007. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007
                                                    ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Expert Report due by 11/30/2007. Status Conference set for 12/6/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Telephonic status conference held on 10/24/2007 to discuss respondent's motion for enlargement of time. (tpj)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007
                                                          RESPONSE to [35] MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2007 to File Expert Report, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY.Reply due by 11/5/2007. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007, Terminated: 10/26/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until December 18, 2007 to File Expert Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 11/5/2007. (Brodrick, Robin)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007
                                                              EXPERT REPORT of Dr. John Shane (Ex. no. 13 and 14) filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Homer, Ronald)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 10/19/2007. Status Conference set for 10/24/2007 at 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007
                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit A, Records from Richland County Sheriff# (2) Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit B, Part 1 - Records from Richland County Coroner# (3) Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit B, Part 2 - Records from Richland County Coroner# (4) Exhibit Respondent's Exhibit B, Part 3 - Records from Richland County Coroner)(Brodrick, Robin)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
                                                                    ORDER re: [29] Order Striking Document. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
                                                                      ORDER re [29] Order Striking Document. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
                                                                        ORDER Striking [27] Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena, [26] Order on Motion to Issue Subpoena. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Records in response to subpoenas due by 8/31/2007. Status Conference set for 9/10/2007 12:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                                            ORDER granting [20] Motion to Issue Subpoena to Sheriff's Department Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                                              ORDER granting [18] Motion to Issue Subpoena to Department of Social Services Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                                                ORDER granting [17] Motion to Issue Subpoena to Coroner's Office Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 7/25/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007
                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference held on 07/24/07 to discuss respondent's motions for subpoena. (Moran, Christian)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 7/24/07 to argue Respondent's motions for subpoenas. (szs)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007
                                                                                      RESPONSE to Order of June 19, 2007, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/19/2007
                                                                                        ORDER granting [22] Motion for Extension of Time. Response due by 7/13/2007. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 6/19/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                          Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/24/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/14/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007, Terminated: 6/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time until July 13, 2007 to responds to Respondent's Motion, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY.Response due by 7/2/2007. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/4/2007, Entered: 6/4/2007
                                                                                              STATUS REPORT, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. (Homer, Ronald)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                MOTION to Issue Subpoena to Richland County Sheriff's Department, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 6/18/2007. (Brodrick, Robin)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 5/12/2008 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                  MOTION to Issue Subpoena to Providence Hospital Northeast, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 6/18/2007. (Brodrick, Robin)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                    MOTION to Issue Subpoena to South Carolina Department of Social Services, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 6/18/2007. (Brodrick, Robin)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007, Terminated: 7/25/2007 Motion to Issue Subpoena
                                                                                                      MOTION to Issue Subpoena to Richland County Coroner, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.Response due by 6/18/2007. (Brodrick, Robin)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007
                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 6/4/2007. Motion due by 6/4/2007. Status Conference set for 7/9/2007 at 1:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (szs)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/18/2007 (tjk, ).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Blank 13 Filed: 4/16/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                            ORDER granting [11] Motion to file electronically Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Blank 15 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Respondent's Report
                                                                                                              Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/13/07. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/18/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/4/2007 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/17/2007, Terminated: 4/16/2007 Terminated:
                                                                                                                  MOTION to designate case as electronic and statement certifying counsel has a valid ECF account, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. Service: 4/05/07.Response due by 4/23/2007. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [9] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Ronald Craig Homer for SHEMEKA N RAMSEY and DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. Attorney Christy Marie DeLuca terminated Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007, Terminated: 3/23/2007 Terminated:
                                                                                                                      MOTION to Substitute Attorney Ronald C. Homer in place of Christy DeLuca, filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. Service: 2/28/07.Response due by 3/19/2007. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 2/21/2007, Entered: 2/26/2007 Medical Records
                                                                                                                        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #3] filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. Service: 2/19/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 2/9/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 Order
                                                                                                                          ORDER re The records submitted to the Court on 1/26/07 marked as Exhibit 3 by petitioner are hereby returned to Petitioner's counsel for the correction of deficiencies. The clerk's office is ORDERED to return the filing and supply Petitioner's Counsel with a copy of the Vaccine Rules and the Guidelines for Practice. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Blank 7 Filed: 2/7/2007, Entered: 2/14/2007 notice of filing
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF FILING [Richland County Emergency Services- previously referred to as Exhibit #6] record by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY. Service: 2/01/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Blank 5 Filed: 2/6/2007, Entered: 2/9/2007 Initial Order
                                                                                                                              INITIAL ORDER The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 2/16/07 to schedule the initial status conference call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Blank 4 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: 2/6/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Lynn Brodrick for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/01/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Blank 2 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Blank 1 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: 1/19/2007 Petition
                                                                                                                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066009) [Vaccination date: 1/20/05][Filed with one volume, Exhibits #1-12], filed by SHEMEKA N RAMSEY, DEMARIUS JAMAR RAMSEY.Respondents Report due by 4/16/2007.(tjk, )
                                                                                                                                      LREF

                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 176 times.

                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?