KANAWHA EAGLE COAL, LLC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00074-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KANAWHA EAGLE COAL, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by merrelltaxlaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Yates Merrell, Jr. +1 703 790 8440 +1 703 790 8944 john.merrell.jr@merrelltaxlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/30/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $110000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/1/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Stoddart, Robert)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/23/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Stoddart, Robert)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER STAYING CASE. The parties shall file a joint status report within 20 days after the Supreme Court's final disposition of United States v. Clintwood Elkhorn Mining Co. (U.S. No. 07-308). Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mjg)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
          STATUS REPORT and Motion for Suspension of Proceedings, filed by USA. (Stoddart, Robert)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER setting deadlines for discovery and joint status report. Discovery to be completed by 2/19/2008; joint status report due by 3/3/2008. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
              JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Stoddart, Robert)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/31/2007, Entered: 5/31/2007
                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 7/23/2007.(Stoddart, Robert)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 5/31/2007. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (bpc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007, Terminated: 3/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/31/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 4/13/2007.(Stoddart, Robert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/19/2007, Entered: 3/19/2007
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for USA. (Stoddart, Robert)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/30/2007, Entered: 1/31/2007 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) (Filing fee $250 and Receipt number 066091) filed by KANAWHA EAGLE COAL, LLC. Answer due by 4/2/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dw1)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 151 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?