COOK v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00106-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TRACY D COOK, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Roland W. Johnson, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space D. Rahn Hostetter +1 541 426 4584 +1 541 426 3281 hklaw@eoni.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca J. Trinrud +1 202 353 7832 +1 202 616 4310 rebecca.trinrud@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/14/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 11/7/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 Order Concluding Proceedings
Order Concluding Proceedings. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Notice of Intent to Withdraw Petition
    NOTICE OF INTENT to Withdraw Petition by Petitioner. Service: 10/31/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/23/2007 Description not available
      ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 10/18/07, the following is ORDERED: Petitioner shall withdraw case no. 07-106, Petitioner shall collect and file 3 years of medical records prior to the vaccination due by 11/19/07, Respondent's obligation to file the Rule 4 report is hereby suspended until further notice, a Status Conference set for 12/6/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007 notice of filing
        NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit(s) [#8 Letter from Tracy Cook, #9-11 Medical Records, #12- Letter from Tracy Cook re: Dr. Cline] by TRACY D COOK, TRACY D COOK. Service: 9/26/07.(tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
          MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/01/07 to file all outstanding medical records, filed by TRACY D COOK, TRACY D COOK. Service: 9/18/07.Response due by 10/5/2007. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: In case 07-106, petitioner may file a Notice of Withdrawl. In case 7-331, petitioner shall file all outstanding Medical Records due by 9/17/07. In case 07-331, respondent's obligation to file a Rule 4 report is suspended until future order. The next Status Conference set for 9/24/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 notice of filing
              NOTICE OF FILING [Letter from Center for Human Development, Inc] by TRACY D COOK. Filed by leave of the Special Master. Service: 5/18/07.(tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 5/24/2007, Entered: 5/25/2007 Order
                ORDER re On 5/22/07 the Clerk's Office received a submission by Ms. Cook. Despite its deficiencies, the Clerk's Office is ORDERED to file the document by leave of the Special Master. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Order
                  ORDER re Ms. Cook's attorney expressed an intention to file a new petition to allege that Ms. Cook received the flu vaccine. The Clerk's Office is ORDERED to accept this petition without a new filing fee. Ms. Cook should refer to this order when she files her new petition. Respondent's obligation to submit a Rule 4 report remains suspended. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 5/21/2007, Entered: 5/21/2007
                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 5/21/07 to determine whether P should amend the petition or file a new one. (szs)
                      LREF
                      Blank 9 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/2/2007 Description not available
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/21/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: 4/27/2007
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Status Conference held on 4/27/07. (szs)
                          LREF
                          Blank 8 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Status Conference Order
                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 4/27/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 7 Filed: 3/29/2007, Entered: 4/5/2007 Description not available
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference call of 3/27/07, Petitioner shall file her vaccination records by 4/23/07. Telephonic Status Conference set for 4/27/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2007, Entered: 3/27/2007
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Initial Status Conference held on 3/27/07. (szs)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 3/8/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Trinrud for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/08/07.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Initial Order
                                  INITIAL ORDER The initial status conference in this case shall be held no later than 4/02/07. Respondent's Rule 4(c) Report is due on 5/15/07. The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 3/19/07 to schedule the initial status conference call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Lynn Brodrick for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/02/07.(tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 2/22/2007, Entered: 2/25/2007 Order
                                      ORDER re The Clerk's Office is ORDERED to provide petitioner's counsel with the forms for admission to the Court of Federal Claims and a copy of the Vaccine Rules and Guidelines. Petitioner is ORDERED to gather any missing medical records and not to file the records until there is a status conference. Respondent is ORDERED to file a Notice of Appearance, and the deadline for the filing of the Rule 4 report is SUSPENDED. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Petition
                                          PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066161) [Vaccination date: 12/12/02], filed by TRACY D COOK.Respondents Report due by 5/15/2007.(tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: 2/21/2007 Remark
                                            Remark. Petition filed with the incorrect number of copies, no index, no page numbers on exhibits, attorney not admitted to the bar of the USCFC. (tjk, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 116 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?