CAMBRIDGE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00142-BAF
District Judge Bohdan A. Futey, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DIAHANN D. CAMBRIDGE, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robert Charles Stoddart +1 202 307 6445 robert.c.stoddart@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/5/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 5/29/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case '07-5133'[]
Def Custody Status
Pending Status AppRecord
Flags ADR, APPEAL, AUTO, CLOSED
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
Appeal record sent to CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Blank 12 Filed: 6/20/2007, Entered: 6/20/2007
    CAFC Case Number 07-5133 for [11] Notice of Appeal filed by DIAHANN D. CAMBRIDGE. (hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 11 Filed: 6/5/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Notice of Appeal
      NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by DIAHANN D. CAMBRIDGE. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
        LREF
        Blank 10 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007
        JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed. No costs. (lld)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007 Court Filing
          OPINION & ORDER granting [6] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6); The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint. No costs. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (lld)
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 5/18/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Reply to Response to Motion
            REPLY to Response to Motion re [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA. Service: 5/17/2007.(hw1, )
              LREF
              Blank 7 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: 5/24/2007 Response to Motion [Dispositive]Court Filing
              RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by DIAHANN D. CAMBRIDGE. Filed by leave of the Judge. Reply due by 5/29/2007. Service: 5/10/2007.(hw1, )
                LREF
                Blank 6 Filed: 4/12/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007 Terminated:
                MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA. Service: 4/12/2007. Response due by 5/14/2007.(hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Charles Stoddart for USA. Service: 3/12/3007.(hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for Auto ADR proceedings. (hw1, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Senior Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (hw1, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Terminated:
                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by DIAHANN D. CAMBRIDGE. Service: 3/5/2007.(hw1, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: 3/6/2007 Complaint
                          COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) filed by DIAHANN D. CAMBRIDGE. Answer due by 5/7/2007.(hw1, )
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 212 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?