STAPLES, INC v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00139-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Staples, Inc. Staples, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kelley Drye & Warren, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Andrew Boyle +1 212 808 7800 +1 212 808 7897 jboyle@kelleydrye.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacob Earl Christensen +1 202 307 0878 +1 202 514 9440 jacob.e.christensen@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/2/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 8/28/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 24 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by USA.. (Christensen, Jacob)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 8/28/2008
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 23 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
        LREF
        Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER Joint Status Report due by 7/1/2008. Signed by Judge Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
          LREF
          Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
            LREF
            Legal Document 20 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER re [19] Joint Status Report filed by USA Parties status report due by 5/2/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 19 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                LREF
                Legal Document 18 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [15] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dph)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 17 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dph)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008
                    JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 15 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007, Terminated: 1/4/2008 Motion for Protective Order
                      MOTION for Protective Order, filed by STAPLES, INC.Response due by 1/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Boyle, Joseph)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER Joint Status Report due by 1/2/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007
                          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER granting [11] Motion to Substitute Attorney. Added attorney Joseph Andrew Boyle for STAPLES, INC. Attorney Paul L. Kattas terminated Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/10/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007, Terminated: 10/15/2007 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                              MOTION to Substitute Attorney Joseph A. Boyle in place of Paul L. Kattas, filed by STAPLES, INC.Response due by 10/29/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Appointment)(Kattas, Paul)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Court Filing
                                ORDER Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (phg, )
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/25/2007
                                  JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: 6/1/2007 Court Filing
                                    PRELIMINARY SCHEDULING CONFERENCE OrderScheduling Conference set for 7/12/2007 11:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007
                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 6/25/2007.(Christensen, Jacob)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Jacob Earl Christensen for USA. (Christensen, Jacob)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/23/2007, Terminated: 8/28/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
                                          Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Paul L. Kattas in place of David R. Yohannan, filed by STAPLES, INC. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Appointment)(Yohannan, David)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                            Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by STAPLES, INC. Service: 3/2/2007.(hw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/8/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (hw1, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/2/2007, Entered: 3/7/2007 Complaint
                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 543557) filed by STAPLES, INC.Answer due by 5/7/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(hw1, )
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?