DOLAN v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00166-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo PAUL E. DOLAN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Glen E. Keller, Jr

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Adams Wickham +1 303 670 3825 +1 303 670 1586 wickham1@wispertel.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anna Bondurant Eley +1 202 616 8254 bondurant.eley@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (51) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/4/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008
ORDER - Plaintiff's unopposed telephonic motion for an extension of time until Oct. 17, 2008, within which to respond to defendant's dispositive motion is granted. The court wishes counsel a speedy recovery. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
    LREF
    Legal Document 38 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008, Terminated: 7/31/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 4 September 2008 to respond to defendant's motion for judgment on the record, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 8/18/2008.(Wickham, John)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
      ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Consent [38] Motion for Extension of Time to Sept. 4, 2008, to respond to defendant's dispositive motion. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller.(smg)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/20/2008
        ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed [37] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response Brief to Aug. 4, 2008. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
          LREF
          Legal Document 37 Filed: 6/19/2008, Entered: 6/19/2008, Terminated: 6/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
          Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [34] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and Appendix, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 7/7/2008.(Wickham, John)
            LREF
            Legal Document 36 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008, Terminated: 6/24/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [34] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and Appendix, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 6/2/2008.(Wickham, John)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008
              ORDER - Granting plaintiff's consent motion [36] for an extension of time until June 20, 2008, within which to file his response to defendant's motion [34] for judgment on the administrative record. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                LREF
                Legal Document 35 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008
                STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [34] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record,, filed by USA. (Eley, Anna)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 34 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 6/24/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                  MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record and Appendix, filed by USA.Response due by 5/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part 1# (2) Appendix Part 2# (3) Appendix Part 3# (4) Appendix Part 4)(Eley, Anna)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 33 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008
                    NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing Administrative Record on CD Rom (Eley, Anna)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 32 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008, Terminated: 4/17/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                      Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Administrative Record on CD-ROM, filed by USA.Response due by 5/5/2008.(Lynch, Ellen)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008
                        ORDER - Granting defendant's unoppposed [32] motion for leave to file the Administrative Record on CD-Rom, with a printed copy to chambers. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 31 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008, Terminated: 3/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 18, 2008 to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 4/14/2008.(Eley, Anna)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008
                            ORDER - Granting Defendant's Unopposed [31] Motion for Extension of Time until April 18, 2008, to respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 30 Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: 3/14/2008
                              AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.. (Wickham, John)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 3/14/2008. (bre, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008
                                  ORDER - Granting plaintiff's unopposed motion (contained in his Notice [29]) for an extension of time until March 14, 2008, within which to file his Amended Complaint. The stay in this case is lifted. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008
                                    NOTICE, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN and motion for enlargement of time (Wickham, John)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Court Filing
                                      ORDER re [26] Order on Motion to Alter Judgment and Remand. Further to Defendant's Status Report filed on Jan. 14, 2008, attaching a copy of the ABCMR's decision denying plaintiff's application for relief, if plaintiff does not elect to accept the decision, by Feb. 14, 2008, he shall file his motion pursuant to RCFC 56.1.Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008
                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit ABCMR Decision)(Eley, Anna)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Court Filing
                                          ORDER denying Plaintiff's [17] Motion for Reconsideration but reserving plaintiff's arguments. Remand is effective Oct. 2, 2007; ABCMR decision by Jan. 7, 2008; defendant's Status Report by Jan. 14, 2008. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [21] Response to Motion (to file one day out of time), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 10/18/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 24 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                              REPLY to Response to Motion re [17] MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN. (Wickham, John)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 23 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Court Filing
                                                ORDER denying Plaintiff's Amended [20] Motion to Disqualify Judge and Defense Counsel. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 22 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Court Filing
                                                  ORDER - Pursuant to RCFC 7.2(a), the court will rule on plaintiff's amended motion to disqualify without further briefing by either party. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 21 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                                                    RESPONSE to [17] MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e), filed by USA.Reply due by 10/4/2007. (Eley, Anna)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 20 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 9/25/2007 Motion to Disqualify JudgeCourt Filing
                                                      Amended MOTION to Disqualify Judge and jointly, opposing counsel, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 10/4/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 19 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                        MOTION to Disqualify Judge and jointly, opposing counsel, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 10/1/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER - re [17] MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e) filed by PAUL E. DOLAN, pursuant to Rule 59(b) defendant shall respond by 9/20/07; plaintiff may reply by 9/27/07. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 17 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007, Terminated: 10/1/2007 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment - Rule 59(e)
                                                            MOTION to Alter or Amend Judgment pursuant to Rule 59(e), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.(Wickham, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting [14] Defendant's Motion to Stay case pending further order of court. Case is stayed for a period of 90 days for remand to the ABCMR(Status Report due by 11/5/2007) re status of plaintiff's claims; temporarily denying [15] plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time and denying plaintiff's motion to strike. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007
                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 24/09/07 to respond to defendant's motion to stay briefing, or in the alternative, plaintiff's motion to strike, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 9/21/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/29/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007, Terminated: 9/4/2007 Motion to Stay
                                                                  MOTION to Stay Briefing on Pending Motions To Allow For A Decision On Defendants Motion For Stay Pending Remand, Or, In The Alternative, For An Enlargement Of Time To Respond To Plaintiffs Motion, filed by USA.Response due by 9/17/2007.(Eley, Anna)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                                                                    NOTICE, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN re [12] Proposed Findings of Uncontroverted Fact, [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment of filing ECF technical error (Wickham, John)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                                                                      PROPOSED FINDINGS of Uncontroverted Fact RE: [11] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN. (Wickham, John)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/14/2007
                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 9/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C# (4) Exhibit D# (5) Exhibit E# (6) Exhibit F# (7) Appendix Volume 1# (8) Appendix Volume 2# (9) Appendix Volume 3# (10) Appendix Volume 4# (11) Appendix Volume 5)(Wickham, John)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007, Terminated: 8/3/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                        Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 8/20/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/3/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007
                                                                          ORDER granting [10] Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to defendant's dispositive motion until August 13, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007
                                                                            ORDER granting [9] Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1)and Rule 12(b)(6) until August 3, 2007.Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007, Terminated: 7/23/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                              Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 8/6/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007, Terminated: 6/27/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                                                                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/20/2007 to File Response or Reply as to [7] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Response due by 7/16/2007.(Wickham, John)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007
                                                                                  ORDER granting [8] Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to [7] Motion To Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6) until July 20, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007
                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA.Response due by 7/16/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A# (2) Exhibit B# (3) Exhibit C)(Eley, Anna)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/29/2007
                                                                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.. (Wickham, John)
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/16/2007, Entered: 5/16/2007
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/13/2007. (lg1, )
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Blank -- Filed: 5/11/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007
                                                                                          ORDER granting [5] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to June 13, 2007. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (smg)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 4/26/2007, Terminated: 5/11/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/13/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/14/2007.(Eley, Anna)
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/23/2007
                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Anna Bondurant Eley for USA. (Eley, Anna)
                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                                                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (lg1, )
                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C.Miller. (lg1, )
                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/13/2007, Entered: 3/14/2007 Complaint
                                                                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (ARM) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066275), filed by PAUL E. DOLAN.Answer due by 5/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(lg1, )
                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 175 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?