KATZ v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00159-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GAIL KATZ, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julia Wernett McInerny +1 202 353 3919 julia.mcinerny@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 3/12/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (44) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 40 Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 39 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 notice of filing
    NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL FILING OF MEDICAL RECORDS by GAIL KATZ. Service: 7/14/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 38 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 notice of filing
      NOTICE OF FILING PETITIONER'S STIPULATIONS WITH REQUEST FOR REWARD AND AWARD by GAIL KATZ. Service: 7/14/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 37 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Description not available
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/1/2008 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 36 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 6/4/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 35 Filed: 4/2/2008, Entered: 4/7/2008 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner Status Report due by 6/6/2008 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 34 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Status Report
              STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 3/25/08.(tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 33 Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: 2/17/2008 Status Report/Order
                STATUS REPORT ORDER Petitioner shall file a Status Report informing the special master about the procedural posture of petitioner's worker's compensation case due by 3/31/2008. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 32 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/17/2008 Status Report
                  SUPPLEMENTAL STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 2/1/08.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 31 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Status Report
                    STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 1/14/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 30 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Wernett McInerny for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/14/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 29 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/3/2008 Medical Records
                        NOTICE OF FILING: SUPPLEMENTAL FILING OF MEDICAL RECORDS. Service: 12/26/07.(tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 28 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          ORDER granting [27] Motion to Suspend the Filing Deadline of the Rule 4(c) Report. By no later than 1/16/08, petitioner shall file a Status Report informing the special master about petitioner's progress in delivering a settlement demand to respondent. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                            Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Report due by 1/16/2008 (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 27 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007, Terminated: 12/12/2007 Terminated:
                              MOTION, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 12/11/07.Response due by 12/28/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                LREF
                                Blank 26 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Notice of Intent to Remain in the Program
                                NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. Service: 11/27/07.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 25 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/20/2007 Medical Records
                                  PETITIONER'S SUPPLEMENTAL FILING OF MEDICAL RECORDS. Service: 11/13/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 24 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                                    ORDER re: the statutory time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 23 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel John McGovern for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/6/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 22 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Description not available
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 11/16/07, petitioner shall file the records that respondent identifies in respondent's 10/12/07 status report. By no later than 12/14/07, respondent shall file the Rule 4 report. In order to narrow issues for resolution in this case, the special master directs respondent to proffer a medical expert's opinion with the Rule 4 report. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 21 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Status Report
                                          STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/12/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 20 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Status Report/Order
                                            STATUS REPORT ORDER By no later than 10/12/07, respondent shall file a Status Report. The Status Report, respondent shall indicate whether petitioner's recent submissions are fully responsive to respondent's request for additional medical records. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 19 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/24/2007 Medical Records
                                              NOTICE OF FILING: MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) A-E Supplemental Filing of Medical Records] filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 9/17/07.(tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007
                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 09/20/2007. Jack Hull, Esq., represented petitioner. Robin Brodrick, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed petitioner's progress in completing the documentary record.(yh)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 18 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Description not available
                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/20/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 17 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: 8/15/2007 Status Report
                                                    STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 7/27/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 16 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Description not available
                                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 8/1/2007 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : A Status Conference was held on July 16, 2007. Mr. Jack Hull appeared via telephone for petitioner. Ms. Robin Brodrick appeared via telephone for respondent. The Special Master reviewed recent filings and discussed deficiencies. (ds2, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 15 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/16/2007 03:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: 6/29/2007 Medical Records
                                                            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #4-6] filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 6/27/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/8/2007 Affidavit
                                                              AFFIDAVIT by GAIL KATZ. Service: 5/23/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 12 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: 6/7/2007
                                                                ORDER: Petitioner shall file the medical records by 6/29/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 11 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: 5/30/2007 Status Report
                                                                  STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 5/16/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: 5/11/2007 Amended Petition
                                                                    AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 4/26/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 4/30/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                                      ORDER Petitioner shall file a Status Report regarding progress in filing the medical records that respondent requested due by 5/18/2007. Further proceedings will be scheduled by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 4/20/2007, Entered: 4/24/2007 Status Report
                                                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/20/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/19/2007 Description not available
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall file a Status Report identifying records that respondent chooses to review prior to filing the Rule 4 report. Petitioner shall file: a comprehensive Affidavit and an Amended Petition due by 5/04/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 4/13/2007, Entered: 4/13/2007
                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: EarlyStatus Conference held on 4/12/07. Jack Hull, Esq., appeared for petitioner. Robin Brodrick, Esq., appeared for respondent. The special master discussed the submission of an amended petition alleging that petitioner has suffered the effects of her putative vaccine-related injury for more than six months after the administration of the vaccine. In addition, the special master discussed additional factual development, including the eventual submission of petitioner's affidavit and outstanding medical records. (Edwards, John)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: 4/8/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: An early Status Conference is set for 4/12/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Both parties shall appear by telephone. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 4/2/2007, Entered: 4/8/2007 Joint Status Report
                                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by GAIL KATZ. Service: 3/29/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 3/23/2007, Entered: 3/29/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Robin Lynn Brodrick for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/23/07.(tjk, )
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 3/15/2007, Entered: 3/18/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                                                    ORDER re Respondent shall immediately enter a Notice of Appearance. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 3/30/2007, proposing three dates and times for the early status conference. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 3/12/2007, Entered: 3/15/2007 Petition
                                                                                        PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066270) [Vaccination date: 10/05/06], filed by GAIL KATZ. [Filed with one volume of records, Exhibit A-E]Respondents Report due by 6/14/2007.(tjk, )
                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                          This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                          Space
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                           
                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                          Need Password Help?