PAULSEN et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00233-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KRISTY PAULSEN, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
No Logo LANDON MICHAEL LEE BERNHORST, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
No Logo SHANNON BERHORST, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/11/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 9/4/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [21] Judgment on Attorney Fees,. Service: 3/7/08.(tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded attorney's fees and costs in the amount of $9,055.69. This award shall be in the form of a check made jointly payable to petitioners and Ms. Mindy Roth in the amount of 49,055.69. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 Notice Not to Seek Review
      NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by KRISTY PAULSEN, SHANNON BERHORST, LANDON MICHAEL LEE BERNHORST re [19] DECISION of Special Master - Fees. Service: 1/30/08.(tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 DECISION of Special Master - Fees
        DECISION on Attorney's Fees and Costs Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/27/2007 Affidavit
          AFFIDAVIT by KRISTY PAULSEN, SHANNON BERHORST, LANDON MICHAEL LEE BERNHORST. Service: 12/18/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007 Petitioner's Election to File Civil Action
            Petitioner's Election to File Civil Action re: [15] Judgment. Service: 9/07/07.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 9/6/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Description not available
              SCHEDULING ORDER:Petitioners shall file Motion(s) due by 6/4/2008. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 9/4/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007
                JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), dismissing the petition. (dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/9/2007 Notice Not to Seek Review
                  NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by KRISTY PAULSEN, SHANNON BERHORST, LANDON MICHAEL LEE BERNHORST re [13] DECISION of Special Master. Service: 7/31/07.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 DECISION of Special Master
                    DECISION Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 7/31/2007
                      Remark:Decision Fedex on 7/31/07, Tracking Number 861928277729 (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
                        ORDER: In light of petitioners' motion for a ruling on the record, the status conference scheduled for 7/31/07 is hereby CANCELLED. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 7/23/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Terminated:
                          MOTION for Judgment on the Record, filed by KRISTY PAULSEN, SHANNON BERHORST, LANDON MICHAEL LEE BERNHORST. Service: 7/17/07.Response due by 8/3/2007. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Status Conference Order
                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/31/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on 7/16/07. Petitioners' counsel informed the court that although petitioners have orally agreed to file a motion for a ruling on the record, she is waiting for a signed letter before filing the motion. The next telephonic status conference shall be held on July 31, 2007, at 10:30 a.m.
                                LREF
                                Blank 8 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Respondent's Report
                                Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/13/07. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/14/2007 Description not available
                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/16/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: 6/13/2007
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on June 13, 2007. Petitioners' counsel informed the court that she is waiting to hear back from petitioners about how they would like to proceed with this case.
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 6 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: 6/11/2007 Order
                                      ORDER: At petitioners' request the telephonic status conference previously scheduled for 6/11/07,2007 shall be RESCHEDULED for 6/13/07, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/15/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: A telephonic status conference was held on 5/11/07. By the next status conference, petitioners shall file page 6 of Exhibit 2 and page 4 of Exhibit 3. The next telephonic status conference shall be held on 6/11/07 at 10:30 a.m.
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: 5/15/2007 Status Conference Order
                                          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/11/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 4 Filed: 5/8/2007, Entered: 5/10/2007 Description not available
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/11/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 3 Filed: 4/26/2007, Entered: 5/1/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Milmoe for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 4/26/07.(tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 2 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/11/2007, Entered: 4/12/2007 Petition
                                                  PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066398) [Vaccination date: 2/07/06][Filed with one volume, Exhibits #1-15], filed by KRISTY PAULSEN, SHANNON BERHORST, LANDON MICHAEL LEE BERNHORST.Respondents Report due by 7/13/2007.(tjk, )
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 179 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?