CURTIS et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00244-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo BARBARA CURTIS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McKinney & Namei Co LPA - 1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Firooz Taghi Namei +1 513 721 0200 firooz@zoomtown.com
No Logo ROBERT E CURTIS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McKinney & Namei Co LPA - 1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Firooz Taghi Namei +1 513 721 0200 firooz@zoomtown.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Voris Edward Johnson +1 202 616 4136 +1 202 616 4310 voris.johnson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/23/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Description not available
SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondents Report due by 10/10/2008. Status Conference set for 10/15/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/5/2008, Entered: 8/5/2008
    MOTION to Amend/Correct [16] MOTION to Supplement Medical Report, filed by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS.Response due by 8/22/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Medical Treatise)(Namei, Firooz)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008
      MOTION to Supplement Medical Report, filed by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS.Response due by 8/18/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit of Dr. Joseph Matsumoto, # (2) Exhibit C.V. of Dr. Joseph Matsumoto)(Namei, Firooz)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 Description not available
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 6/9/2008. Status Conference set for 6/17/2008 09:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/29/2008 Status Conference Order
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Petitioner shall continue to pursue the filing of a medical expert, until which time Respondent's Expert Report is held in abeyance. The next Status Conference is set for 5/22/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
            ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Description not available
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file Expert Report due by 2/29/08, until which time, Respondent's Expert Report is held in abeyance. The next Status Conference is set for 3/3/2008 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 notice of filing
                NOTICE OF FILING Petitioners exhibit, 1/15/08 letter from Dr.Matsumoto. by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS. Service: 1/23/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007 notice of filing
                  NOTICE OF FILING [October 9, 2007 letter from Dr. Matsumoto] by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS. Service: 10/09/07.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Description not available
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 12/5/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 notice of filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit Volume V Nos 1-4, Ex-1 Letter from Joseph Y. Matsumoto, M.D., Ex-2 Discharge Diagnosis, August 22, 2007, Ex-3 Clinton Memorial Patient Records (updated), Petitioners' Ex-4 Lange, Dale J., Norman Latov& Werner Trojaborg. by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS. Service: 10/15/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 8/30/2007, Entered: 8/31/2007 Description not available
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/17/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Medical Records
                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #1-4] filed by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS. Service: 7/12/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 5/22/2007, Entered: 5/23/2007 Description not available
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/30/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Petitioners shall file the materials pursuant to the status conference by 7/20/07 Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 5/4/2007, Entered: 5/5/2007 Status Conference Order
                              INITIAL ORDER: Conference call set for 5/21/2007 12:30 PM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 5/1/2007, Entered: 5/4/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Voris Edward Johnson for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/01/07.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 4/23/2007, Entered: 4/25/2007 Petition
                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066429) [Vaccination date: 10/11/05]{Filed with Exhibits #1-17}, filed by ROBERT E CURTIS, BARBARA CURTIS.Respondents Report due by 7/26/2007.(tjk, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 140 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?