ISABEL v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00415-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANN M ISABEL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Brennan, Robins & Daley

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jeffrey A. Golvash +1 412 281 0776 +1 412 281 2180 jgolvash@brd-law.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Francis Topping, Jr. +1 202 305 1586 +1 202 305 4130 richard.topping@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/25/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 8/1/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 21 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/16/2008 Petitioner's Election to Accept Judgment
Petitioner's Election to Accept [20] Judgment. Service: 8/5/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 20 Filed: 8/1/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioner is awarded compensation in the amount of $85,000.00 in the form of a check payable to petitioner. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 19 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008 Notice Not to Seek Review
      JOINT NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by ANN M ISABEL, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [18] DECISION of Special Master. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 18 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 DECISION of Special Master
        UNPUBLISHED DECISION Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/7/2008 Remark
          Remark A copy of the Decision of the Special Master dated 6/30/08 was sent to Petitioner's Counsel on 6/30/08 via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery. Tracking no. 8665 1083 7661 (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 7/1/2008 Stipulation
            JOINT STIPULATION, filed by ANN M ISABEL, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/23/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/29/2008 15-Week Stipulation Order
              15-Week SETTLEMENT ORDER: Respondent shall, within 15 weeks, send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation and file a status report. Within 30 days after the receipt of the stipulation, the petitioner(s) shall file a status report. Within 15 days after receiving the stipulation from petitioner(s), the respondent shall file the signed stipulation.Respondents Status Report due by 7/3/2008. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Order
                ORDER re A status conference was held on 3/13/08, at which time the parties updated the Court on their progress towards resolving this case short of a hearing. Respondent's 4(c) Report continues to held in abeyance. The parties were ordered to contact the Court via the undersigned's law clerk no later than 3/19/08, to note their position on the resolution of this case. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Status Conference Order
                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A status conference was held on 2/27/08, Respondent is reviewing settlement options, consequently, the 4(c) Report continues to be held in abeyance. The next Status Conference is set for 3/13/2008 09:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/5/2008 notice of filing
                      NOTICE OF FILING THIRD SUPPLEMENTAL TABLE OF CONTENTS OF PETITIONER'S EXHIBITS #2,18 by ANN M ISABEL. Service: 1/25/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Francis Topping, Jr for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/15/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Expert Report
                          NOTICE OF FILING: NARRATIVE REPORT and CV of Dr. Preston (Ex. no. 15) and Petitioner's Affidavit (Ex. no. 16) filed by ANN M ISABEL. Service: 12/03/07.(tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Description not available
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 12/10/07: Petitioner shall file, on or before 1/31/08, a supplemental or amended medical expert opinion report in support of petitioner's allegations fo actual causation. Petitioner is ordered to file extant records from Dr. Sneff or an attorney affidavit of unavailability. The next Status Conference set for 2/11/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007 Description not available
                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file all remaining MEDICAL RECORDS, FACT WITNESS AFFIDAVITS, and the EXPERT REPORT by close of business 12/04/07. Status Conference set for 12/10/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. The filing of Respondent's Rule 4(c) Report is held in abeyance. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Status Conference Order
                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 9/25/07: The court ordered Petitioner to complete teh remaining filing as promised, and ordered Respondent to contact Petitioner to request any additional medical records that are patently absent. Status Conference set for 10/15/2007 09:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 9/24/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007 Medical Records
                                  Petitioner's MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #4-14] filed by ANN M ISABEL. Service: 9/20/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Description not available
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Medical records due by 9/24/2007. Status Conference set for 9/27/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel John McGovern for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/9/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                        INITIAL ORDER. Once Respondent's Counsel enters a Notice of Appearance, the parties shall contact the Court to schedule the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/25/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Petition
                                            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066715) [Vaccination date: 1/17/04](Filed with Exhibits #1-12), filed by ANN M ISABEL.Respondents Report due by 9/27/2007.(tjk, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 143 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?