CUPPLER v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00416-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RICHARD CUPPLER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by freeholdlawyers.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space VINCENT P. MANNING +1 732 462 4405 vmanning@freeholdlawyers.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Ann Watts +1 202 616 4099 lisa.a.watts@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/26/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 9/11/2008, Entered: 9/14/2008 Status Conference Order
STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: A status conference was held on 9/10/08, the parties are pursing joint efforts in which to supply the Court with the required outstanding records. The next Status Conference is set for 9/18/2008 09:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Description not available
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/31/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/25/2008 Order
      ORDER: Pursuant to Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims-see Rule 45(a)(3) of the main body of the Rules, and also Appendix B,Rule 7(c)-Petitioner's Counsel is hereby authorized tosign and serve a subpoena duces tecum upon Monmouth Medical Center, located at 300 Second Avenue, in Long Branch, New Jersey 07764, for Legible copies of all medical records pertaining to Richard Cuppler, the Petitioner in this case, and his admission and stay there during the period extending 3 August 2003 and 23 August 2003(inclusive). Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order
        SUBPOENA ORDER, Petitioner's Counsel is hereby authorized to sign and serve subpoena ducs upon River Medical Center, Located at ONE RIVERVIEW PLAZA, RED BANK, NEW JERSY O7701, for legible copies of all medical records pertaining to Richard Cuppler. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order
          SUBPOENA ORDER, Petitioner's Counsel is hereby authorized to sign and serve subpoena ducs upon Columbia University Hospital, Located at 630 West 168th Street, New York, New York 10032, for legible copies of all medical records pertaining to Richard Cuppler. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008 Order
            SUBPOENA ORDER, Petitioner's Counsel is hereby authorized to sign and serve a subpoena duces tecum upon Monmouth Medical Center, Located at 300 Second Avenue, in Long Branch, New Jersey 07764 for legible copies of all medical records pertaining to Richard Cuppler. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo) Modified on 4/9/2008 (Neal, Alonzo).
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/29/2008 Description not available
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 3/18/08 the following is ORDERED: Petitioner shall file the missing medical records noted by Respondent due by 5/19/2008. The next Status Conference is set for 5/22/2008 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Order
                  ORDER re The Court conducted a Status Conference on 3/3/08. Petitioner's counsel's represented that all outstanding medical records and a medical expert report had been sent for filing. Petitioner was adjured to resolve the issue of proof of vaccination receipt as soon as practicable. Respondent's 4(c) report continues to be held in abeyance. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Medical Records
                    MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #1-1593] filed by RICHARD CUPPLER. Service: 2/27/08.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Description not available
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon oral motion of Petitioner, the Court GRANTS the oral motion for an extension of time within which to file the materials previously ordered by the Court. The records are now due by 2/27/08. Respondent's Rule 4(c) report continues to be held in abeyance, pending Petitioner's upcoming filings. The next Status Conference is set for 3/3/2008 10:00 AM (EST) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Order
                        ORDER: Petitioner's Counsel is hereby authorized to sign and serve a subpoena duces tecum upon CVS Pharmacy, located at 1 CVS Drive, Woodsocket,RI 02894, for legible copies of all medical records pertaining to Richard Cuppler, the Petitioner in this case. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007 Description not available
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 1/8/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Status Conference Order
                            ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 8/23/07 the Petitioner has been ordered to file all medical files for the three years preceding the vaccination, Petitioner's hospitalization records, and the continuing neurological visit records leading up to the present time. Petitioner shall also file a vaccination record to clarify that petitioner received a Table vaccine, all of Petitioner's medical records created three years prior to the vaccination date including up to the present day. The Court ordered Petitioner to file all relevant fact witness affidavits. The court also ORDERED the Petitioner to pursue a medical expert report to opine in support of the petition. The next Status Conference is set for 10/16/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Watts for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/16/07.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                INITIAL ORDER. Once Respondent's Counsel enters a Notice of Appearance, the parties shall contact the Court to schedule the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/26/2007, Entered: 6/27/2007 Petition
                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066714) [Vaccination date: 10/22/02] (Filed with Exhibits #1-10), filed by RICHARD CUPPLER.Respondents Report due by 9/27/2007.(tjk, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?