THORNTON v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00475-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo KAYE THORNTON, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Bodoin Agnew & Greene

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Margaret Miles Pigg Leaf +1 817 377 1654 +1 817 377 1213 meg@bodoinlaw.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca J. Trinrud +1 202 353 7832 +1 202 616 4310 rebecca.trinrud@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 26 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008 DECISION of Special Master
DECISION Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 25 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 Stipulation
    JOINT STIPULATION, filed by KAYE THORNTON, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/8/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 24 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/18/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 23 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Description not available
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondent shall, within fifteen(15) weeks, by 8/26/2008,send petitioner(s) the joint stipulation for petitioner(s)' signature. Additionally, respondent shall file a status report advising the court of the date the stipulation was forwarded to petitioner. Petitioner(s) shall, within thirty (30) days after the receipt of the stipulation, either return the stipulation to the respondent and file a status report notifying the court of the same, or file a status report detailing the status of the settlement. Respondent shall file the signed stipulation within fifteen (15) days af6ter its receipt from petitioner(s). The hearing scheduled for May 19,in Fort Worth, Texas is CANCELLED. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 22 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Description not available
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to discussions during the 5/6/08 conference, the following is ORDERED: Petitioner is required to elicit evidence regarding relationship between the flu vaccination and onset of symptoms; Respondent may consider filing Medical Literature supporting Dr. Cohen's assertions; The parties should make an effort to file additional Medical Literature by 5/14/08; The hearing will proceed on the issue of Entitlement, however the parties may question Dr. Leavens and Dr. Cohen regarding their opinions on the sequella; The hearing remains scheduled for 5/19/08 at 9:30 AM, at the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas, Eldon B. Mahon United States Courthouse, Courtoom 501, 501 W 10th Street, Fort Worth, TX 76102-3637. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/6/2008
            Minute Entry for proceeding held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Pre-Hearing Conference (telephonic) held on 5/6/2008 to discuss procedure for hearing and filing of additional medical literature. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(fs)
              LREF
              Blank 21 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Description not available
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 5/19/2008 09:00 AM in Out of Town Location: United States District Court for Texas Eldon B. Mahon, United States Courthouse Courtroom # 501 501 W.10 Street Fort Worth, Texas 76102-3637 before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Status Conference set for 5/6/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 20 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 notice of filing
                NOTICE OF FILING RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF FILING EXHIBITS # 5-6 by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/21/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank 19 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Medical Literature
                  NOTICE OF FILING: MEDICAL LITERATURE [Exhibit #R (1-8)] filed by KAYE THORNTON. Service: 2/18/08.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 18 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Expert Report
                    NOTICE OF FILING: SUPPLEMENTAL EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Jeffrey Cohen (Ex. no. 3),Webpage information (Ex. no. 4) and Notice of Requested Medical Literature (Ex. 5-6) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/19/08.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 17 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Description not available
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: A hearing will be held in this matter on 5/19/2008 at 9:30 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran in Fort Worth, Texas. Details concerning the exact location of the hearing will follow in a future order. A Prehearing Status Conference is set for 5/6/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. The deadline of 2/18/08 remains in place for both a supplemental report from Dr. Cohen and medical literature from either party. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran: Telephonic status conference held on 01/25/2008 to discuss scheduling a hearing. (tpj)
                          LREF
                          Blank 16 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Description not available
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to discussions at the status conference: Petitioner shall file her next exhibit assigned with exhibit letter R; Status Conference shall be held on 1/25/2008 02:00 PM to discuss scheduling the hearing; each party shall may present medical articles supporting their assertions regarding CIDP due by 2/18/08; Respondent may file a Supplemental Report from Dr. Cohen due by 2/18/08. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference held on 1/14/08 to set hearing date. (szs)
                              LREF
                              Blank 15 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008 Affidavit
                              NOTICE OF FILING. SUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT of Dr. Leavens re [14] Scheduling Order, by KAYE THORNTON. Service: 1/07/08.(tjk, )
                                LREF
                                Blank 14 Filed: 12/12/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007 Description not available
                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a Supplemental Expert Report due by 1/7/08. The next Status Conference is set for 1/14/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran, the special master's office will initiate the call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 13 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007 Medical Records
                                  MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #N and O] filed by KAYE THORNTON. Service: 12/5/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 12 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until for thirty days, that the status conference scheduled for 12/11/07 be rescheduled for a later date to be determined by the Court, and for such further relief as she may be entitiled to, filed by KAYE THORNTON. Service: 12/03/07.Response due by 12/20/2007. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 11 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Description not available
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to discussions in the 10/05/07 conference, the following is ORDERED: Ms. Thornton is ORDERED to gather and to file any missing medical records. The deadline for the filing of Ms. Thornton's Supplemental Report from Dr. Leavens and/or a report from another expert is 12/04/07. The next status conference is set for 12/11/07 at 11:00 AM. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference to discuss Respondent's Report held on 10/5/07. (Moran, Christian)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 10 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Respondent's Report
                                          Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/27/07. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 9 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Medical Records
                                            NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibit M, Volume V - Supplemental Medical Records 8/98 - Present] filed by KAYE THORNTON. Service: 9/19/07.(tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Description not available
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondent shall file its Rule 4 report by 9/27/2007. Status Conference set for 10/5/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 7 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Medical Records
                                                Petitioner MEDICAL RECORDS of Dr. Ellis Minton[Exhibit(s) #L] filed by KAYE THORNTON. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                  Set Deadlines/Hearings: Respondents Report due by 9/27/2007. (tjk, )
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 6 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Description not available
                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondents Report due by 9/27/2007. Status Conference set for 10/5/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007
                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Initial Status Conference held on 8/7/07. (szs)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 5 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/6/2007 Description not available
                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/7/2007 11:00 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 4 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007
                                                          INITIAL ORDER: Status conference in this case shall be held no later than 8/14/07. Respondent's Rule 4(c) Report is due on 9/27/07, unless otherwise modified by the court. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 3 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Trinrud for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/17/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Chritian Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Petition
                                                                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066778) [Vaccination date: 10/28/99], filed by KAYE THORNTON.Respondents Report due by 10/1/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                  LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 146 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?