WEINEWUTH et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00474-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LOIS E WEINEWUTH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McKinney & Namei Co LPA - 1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Firooz Taghi Namei +1 513 721 0200 firooz@zoomtown.com
No Logo ROBERT J WEINEWUTH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McKinney & Namei Co LPA - 1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Firooz Taghi Namei +1 513 721 0200 firooz@zoomtown.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rebecca J. Trinrud +1 202 353 7832 +1 202 616 4310 rebecca.trinrud@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
Flag ECF
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008
NOTICE OF FILING Notice of Filing Additional Articles Referenced in Dr. Reed's Medical Report by LOIS E WEINEWUTH, ROBERT J WEINEWUTH. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Davis, LE. "Viral diseases of the nervous system", # (2) Supplement Rust R, Menkes JH. "Autoimmune and postinfectious diseases", # (3) Supplement Victor, Ropper & Adams Article)(Namei, Firooz)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
    ORDER Notice of Compliance due by 9/3/2008. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
      Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 9/3/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/16/2008, Entered: 7/16/2008
        MOTION to Supplement Medical Record of Dr. Reed, filed by ROBERT J WEINEWUTH.Response due by 8/4/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Supplemental Letter of Dr. Reed)(Namei, Firooz)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/23/2008
          SCHEDULING ORDER:Affidavit due by 7/21/2008. Medical literature due by 7/21/2008. Medical records due by 7/21/2008. Expert Report due by 7/21/2008. Motion(s) due by 7/21/2008. Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2008 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
            Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # (1) Expert Report, # (2) Curriculum Vitae)(Trinrud, Rebecca)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Respondents Report due by 5/19/2008. Status Conference set for 5/22/2008 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days.Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                  EXPERT REPORT of Robert Lewis Reed, M.D. (Ex. no. A, B, C, C1, C2) filed by LOIS E WEINEWUTH, ROBERT J WEINEWUTH. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A, Dr. Reed Curriculum Vitae# (2) Exhibit Exhibit B, examination detail# (3) Exhibit Exhibit C, References# (4) Exhibit Exhibit C1, References# (5) Exhibit Exhibit C2, References)(Namei, Firooz)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Expert Report due by 2/29/2008. Status Conference set for 3/3/2008 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007
                      ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Notice of Compliance due by 1/4/2008. Petitioner's Counsel shall contact Respondent and the Court to reschedule the status conference at which he failed to appear. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 12/20/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007
                        Set Deadlines/Hearings: Show Cause Response due by 1/4/2008. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, filed by ROBERT J WEINEWUTH re [16] Additional Documentation Guardianship letter. (Namei, Firooz)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
                            ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTATION by ROBERT J WEINEWUTH. (Namei, Firooz)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, filed by ROBERT J WEINEWUTH re [14] Medical Records Prior to Vaccine. (Namei, Firooz)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
                                MEDICAL RECORDS. (Namei, Firooz)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE, filed by ROBERT J WEINEWUTH re [12] Amended Petition. (Namei, Firooz)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007
                                    AMENDED PETITION re: [1] Petition filed by ROBERT J WEINEWUTH. (Namei, Firooz)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/28/2007 11:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (IRK)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                                        STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Trinrud, Rebecca)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Blank 7 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                            ORDER: At the status conference held on 9/28/07, Petitioner moved to convert the case to electronic. The motion is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall convert this case to ECF filing. The next Status Conference set for 10/29/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 8 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 10/3/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                              MOTION TO CONTINUE STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2007., filed by LOIS E WEINEWUTH, ROBERT J WEINEWUTH. Service: 9/24/07.Response due by 10/12/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Description not available
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER:Medical records due by 9/24/2007. Status Conference set for 9/28/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Trinrud for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/11/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007
                                                    NOTICE OF FILING [Exhibits #1-10 - Volumes I-III] by LOIS E WEINEWUTH, ROBERT J WEINEWUTH. Service: (Copy to DOJ).(tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/6/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007
                                                      INITIAL ORDER. Once Respondent's Counsel enters a Notice of Appearance, the parties shall contact the Court to schedule the Rule 4(a) status conference. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Petition
                                                          PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066777) [Vaccination date: 10/6/99], filed by LOIS E WEINEWUTH, ROBERT J WEINEWUTH.Respondents Report due by 10/1/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 123 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?