PARKER v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00471-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo LUANN PARKER, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by McKinney & Namei Co LPA - 1

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Firooz Taghi Namei +1 513 721 0200 firooz@zoomtown.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Voris Edward Johnson +1 202 616 4136 +1 202 616 4310 voris.johnson@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 8/28/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Order Concluding Proceedings
Order Concluding Proceedings Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 08/28/2007. Firooz Namei, Esq., represented petitioner. Voris Johnson, Jr., Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed petitioner's notice of dismissal.(yh)
      LREF
      Blank 8 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Motion to Dismiss
      MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss, filed by LUANN PARKER. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 7 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: 7/26/2007
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner Status Report due by 8/31/2007. Respondent shall file a status report by no later than 8/31/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/22/2007 Status Conference Order
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: An early Status Conference is set for 7/26/2007 10:00 AM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Both parties shall appear by telephone. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Joint Status Report
            JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/18/07.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/11/2007 Notice of Appearance/
              NOTICE of Appearance by Voris Edward Johnson for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/10/07.(tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Status Report/Order
                ORDER re Respondent shall enter immediately a notice of appearance. By no later than 7/18/07, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding an early status conference due by 7/18/2007 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special John Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Petition
                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066774) [Vaccination date: 10/9/98], filed by LUANN PARKER.Respondents Report due by 10/1/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 101 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?