HODGES v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00472-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANDREA HODGES, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James John Orland +1 562 988 8440 +1 562 988 8442 jjjorland@adelphia.net
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Francis Topping, Jr. +1 202 305 1586 +1 202 305 4130 richard.topping@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (36) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
Minute Entry for proceeding held in Santa Ana, CA on 9/8/2008 held before Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz: Fact Hearing held on 9/8/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official record of proceeding taken by court reporter. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
    LREF
    Blank 29 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 Witness List
    Witness List, filed by ANDREA HODGES. Service: 8/20/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 28 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/26/2008 Hearing Order
      HEARING ORDER: The hearing in this case scheduled for 9/08/08 at 10:00 AM, shall be held at the United States District Court for the Central District of California, 1-053 Ronald Reagan Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 411 West Fourth Street, Santa Ana, California 92701. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/31/2008, Entered: 7/31/2008
        Minute Entry for proceeding held telephonically on 7/14/2008 held before Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz: Status Conference held on 7/14/2008 to discuss CSM taking over case and Hearing scheduled for September 2008 to deal with factual issues. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
          ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Masters Gary J. Golkiewicz. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT, filed by ANDREA HODGES. Service: 3/27/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 3/31/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008 Order
              ORDER re A hearing limited to issues of fact shall commence on 9/28/08, at 9:30 AM, local time, in Southern California. The special master will inform the parties about the exact location of the hearing by later order. All witnesses shall appear in person. By no later than 8/1/2008, petitioner shall file a witness list identifying the fact witnesses who will testify at the hearing scheduled for 9/08/08. Petitioner must ensure that petitioner has proffered an affidavit for each fact witness identified in the witness list. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT regarding the availability of the parties for a Hearing, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/20/08.(tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Notice of Intent to Remain in the Program
                  NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. Service: 3/10/08.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Status Report/Order
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER re By no later than 3/28/08, the parties shall file a Joint Status Report informing the Special Master about the parties' progress in confirming with all potential witnesses dates for a hearing limited to the issues of fact in Southern California. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 2/28/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                      ORDER re: the statutory time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008
                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 2/25/2008. James Orland, Esq., represented petitioner. Richard Topping, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed scheduling a hearing, limited to factual issues, in Southern California. (Edwards, John)
                          LREF
                          Blank 20 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Description not available
                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/25/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Respondent's Report
                            Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/25/08. (Neal, Alonzo)
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Francis Topping, Jr for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/15/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007 Joint Status Report
                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by ANDREA HODGES. Service: 12/20/07.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 12/12/2007. James Orland, Esq., represented petitioner. Nathaniel McGovern, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed the progress of the factual development of the case.(yh)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 16 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007 Description not available
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall consult. They shall identify cooperatively any outstanding documents. By no later than 12/21/07, they shall file a Joint Status Report. By no later than 1/25/08, respondent shall file a preliminary Rule 4 report. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 15 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 notice of filing
                                      NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits #14-21 [Medical records and Affidavits] and STATUS REPORT by ANDREA HODGES. Service: 11/30/07.(tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 14 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Description not available
                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: By no later than 11/30/07, petitioner shall file: all outstanding Medical Records, a Supplemental Affidavit, Employment Attendance records (if pertinent); and Affidavits from all other potential fact witnesses.The Special Master will schedule further proceedings - including the submission of respondent's Rule 4 report - by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 11/2/2007. James Orland, Esq., represented petitioner. Nathaniel McGovern, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed petitioner's progress in providing medical records that respondent requested in an August 2007 status report.(yh)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 13 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007 Description not available
                                            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 11/2/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 12 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007 Medical Records
                                              MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #10-13]Ex-10 Medical Records from Sierra Doctors Medical Group, Ex- 11 Medical Records from Alyssa Wargala, PA-C (6/8/0), Ex-12 Consultation Report by Kenneth B. Wiesner, M.D., Ex-13 Medical Records from Alyssa Wargala, PA-C (10/6/06) filed by ANDREA HODGES. Service: 10/1/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 11 Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/20/2007 Description not available
                                                SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 9/17/07: By no later than 10/05/07, petitioner shall file: the records that respondent requested in a 8/22/07 status report; a supplemental affidavit; employment attendance records, if pertinent; and affidavits from all other potential fact witnesses. If petitioner cannot meet the time frame provided by this order, petitioner shall file a Status Report regarding progress in completing the factual investigation of this case. The special master will schedule the submission of respondent's Rule 4 report by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank -- Filed: 9/18/2007, Entered: 9/18/2007
                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Status Conference held on 9/17/2007. James Orland, Esq., represented petitioner. Nathaniel McGovern, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed petitioner's progress in any additional factual investigation.(yh)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 10 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/17/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 9 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: 8/24/2007 Status Report
                                                      STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/22/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 8 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                        STATUS REPORT ORDERStatus Report due by 8/22/2007 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 7 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 8/2/2007 Description not available
                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER:Respondent Status Report due by 8/20/2007 Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 7/30/2007
                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards: Early Status Conference held on 7/30/07. James Orland, Esq., represented petitioner. Nathaniel McGovern, Esq., represented respondent. The special master discussed the production of outstanding documents; potential factual issues for resolution; and potential medical issues for resolution. (Edwards, John)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 6 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Status Conference Order
                                                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/30/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 5 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Joint Status Report
                                                                JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/18/07.(tjk, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 4 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: 7/13/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel John McGovern for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/12/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 3 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/6/2007 Status Report/Order
                                                                    ORDER. Respondent shall immediately enter a notice of appearance. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report regarding the early status conference due by 7/18/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/2/2007 Petition
                                                                        PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066775) [Vaccination date: 10/29/03], filed by ANDREA HODGES.Respondents Report due by 10/1/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                                          LREF

                                                                          Statistics

                                                                          This case has been viewed 108 times.

                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                          Space
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                           
                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                          Need Password Help?