PITTMAN v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00488-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARY LOU PITTMAN, Petitioner
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 6/29/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 12 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/30/2008 Order
ORDER re The Clerk's Office received a letter dated 3/7/08, from Attorney Scott Rooney accompanied by a motion to withdraw as counsel for Ms. Pittman. Mr. Rooney never filed a notice of appearance to represent Ms. Pittman. Thus, his motion has not been filed. The Clerk's Office is ordered to return a letter to Mr. Rooney with a copy of this order. Ms. Pittman is ORDERED to file a statement indicating that she intends to continue her case. This deadline for Ms. Pittman to submit this statement is 4/25/08. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 11 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 3/2/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
    ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 10 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/12/2007 Description not available
      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/24/2007 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference held on 9/10/07. Attorney to file notice of appearance and file add'l medical records. (szs)
          LREF
          Blank 9 Filed: 9/5/2007, Entered: 9/7/2007 ~Notice (other)
          NOTICE (Waiver of Filing Fee, Income and Expenses), filed by MARY LOU PITTMAN re [4] Order. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 8 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/8/2007 Description not available
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 9/10/2007 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/7/2007
              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Initial Status Conference held on 8/7/07. (szs)
                LREF
                Blank 7 Filed: 8/1/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Description not available
                SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/7/2007 10:30 AM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank 6 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Initial Order
                  INITIAL ORDER. The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 8/02/07, to schedule the initial status conference call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 5 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Milmoe for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/16/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 4 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007
                      ORDER: Affidavit due by 8/13/07. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 3 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 MOTION for Leave to Proceed Informa Pauperis
                        MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by MARY LOU PITTMAN. {Included in the body of the petition) (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 2 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 1 Filed: 6/29/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Petition
                            PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee $250), filed by MARY LOU PITTMAN.Respondents Report due by 10/1/2007.(tjk, )
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 160 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?