SIGAL et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00489-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ELI SIGAL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell E. Nordstrom +1 714 750 1010 +1 714 750 0786
No Logo SALLY SIGAL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Russell E. Nordstrom +1 714 750 1010 +1 714 750 0786
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Althea Walker Davis +1 202 616 0515 +1 202 353 2988 althea.davis@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/2/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Special Master
County None
Terminated 7/2/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 17 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 16 Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008 DECISION of Special Master
    DECISION Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 5/23/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Remark
      Remark. A copy of the Decision of the Special Master dated 5/23/08 was sent to Petitioner's Counsel by the Clerk on 5/23/08, via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 notice of filing
        NOTICE OF FILING REPLY TO PETITIONER'S RESPONSE TO RESPONDENT'S MOTION TO DISMISS by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/13/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Terminated:
          MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/13/08 due to other commitments, respondent's counsel was unable to provide respondent's response, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/13/08.Response due by 5/30/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 4/21/2008, Entered: 4/25/2008 Response to Motion
            RESPONSE to [6] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 21(b), filed by SALLY SIGAL, ELI SIGAL. Service: 4/18/08.Reply due by 5/5/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/16/2008 Description not available
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitionere's motion is GRANTED. Petitioner shall file a response to Respondent's motion to dismiss by 4/18/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Description not available
                SCHEDULING ORDER: A status conference was held on 3/05/08 to discuss Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. Ms. Sigal shall file a brief in Response to the [6] Motion to Dismiss due by 4/4/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 3/2/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                  ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 2/19/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Status Conference Order
                    ORDER: The STAY in this case is hereby LIFTED. A Status Conference is set for 3/5/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Both parties should be prepared to discuss whether Zatuchni v. Secretary of Health and Human Services, Fed. Cir. No. 2007-5034, affects the pending motion to dismiss. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/8/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Status Report
                      STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/08/08.(tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/11/2007 Order
                        ORDER re [6] MOTION to Dismiss. Petitioner's obligation to respond to this motion is STAYED. Respondent is ORDERED to file a Status Report about Zatuchni. The deadline for filing this status report is the earlier of two dates: either within two weeks of the date that Zatuchni is decided, or 2/08/08. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Terminated:
                          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 21(b), filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/1/07.Response due by 10/18/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Initial Order
                            INITIAL ORDER The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 7/30/07, to schedule the initial status conference call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: 7/12/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Althea Walker Davis for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/11/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 7/10/2007, Entered: 7/10/2007
                                ORDER: Pursuant to Vaccine Rule 3(c), the above case is reassigned to Special Master Christian Moran. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 7/2/2007, Entered: 7/3/2007 Petition
                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066794), filed by SALLY SIGAL, ELI SIGAL.Respondents Report due by 10/4/2007.(tjk, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 204 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?