MOJICA et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00501-CFL
District Judge Charles F. Lettow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSHUA ACEVEDO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
No Logo JULIO ACEVEDO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
No Logo YLUMINADA MOJICA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather Lynn Pearlman +1 202 353 2699 heather.pearlman2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/3/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Dismissed by Court
County None
Terminated 11/30/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (29) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 25 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Masters Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank 24 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
    JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Appendix B, Rule 30, that the petition is dismissed. No costs on review. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 23 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007 Order on Motion for ReviewCourt Filing
      OPINION AND ORDER denying [17] Motion for Review; [17] MOTION for Review of [16] DECISION of Special Master filed by JOSHUA ACEVEDO, YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment dismissing the petition. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (lld)
        LREF
        Blank 22 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 notice of filing
        NOTICE OF FILING Formal Request for the Court to reserve Decision on Petitioners Motion for Review by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 11/9/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 TranscriptCourt Filing
          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-29) held on October 29, 2007 before Judge Charles F. Lettow. (mb2)
            LREF
            Blank 20 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
            SCHEDULING ORDER: Hearing set for 10/29/2007 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Charles F. Lettow. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dw1)
              LREF
              Blank 19 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007 Response to Motion
              RESPONSE to [17] MOTION for Review of [16] DECISION of Special Master, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 10/12/07. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 18 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank 17 Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007, Terminated: 11/28/2007 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Review of [16] DECISION of Special Master, filed by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 9/19/07. Response to Motion for Review due by 10/22/2007. (dls)
                    LREF
                    Blank -- Filed: 9/20/2007, Entered: 9/21/2007 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                    Case assigned to Judge Charles F. Lettow. (dls)
                      LREF
                      Blank 16 Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/3/2007 DECISION of Special Master
                      DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 8/31/2007, Entered: 9/4/2007 Remark
                        Remark: A copy of the 8/31/07 Decision was sent via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery to Petitioner's counsel on 8/31/07. Tracking no. 8619-2827-7865 (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 15 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 notice of filing
                          NOTICE OF FILING Reply Affidavit of Mindy Michaels Roth by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 8/27/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Response to Motion
                            RESPONSE to [10] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 21(b), filed by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 8/21/07.Reply due by 9/4/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/22/2007 Description not available
                              SCHEDULING ORDER:Response due by 8/31/2007. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                LREF
                                Blank 12 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/16/2007 Response to Motion
                                RESPONSE to [10] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 21(b), filed by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 8/14/07.Reply due by 8/27/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 11 Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/5/2007 Order
                                  ORDER re [10] MOTION to Dismiss filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Petitioners shall file a Response to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss due by 8/31/07. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 8/2/2007, Entered: 8/5/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Petitioner's Response to Motion to Dismiss due by 8/31/2007. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 10 Filed: 7/31/2007, Entered: 8/3/2007 Terminated:
                                      MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 21(b), filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/31/07.Response due by 8/17/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 9 Filed: 7/30/2007, Entered: 8/1/2007 Affidavit
                                        AFFIDAVIT by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 7/23/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 8 Filed: 7/20/2007, Entered: 7/24/2007 Order
                                          ORDER re The Special Master VACATES the Scheduling Order entered on 7/16/07. The Special Master will schedule further proceedings by later order. Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : A Status Conference was held on July 18, 2007. Ms. Mindy Michaels Roth appeared via telephone for petitioner. Mr. Vincent Matanoski appeared via telephone for respondent. The Special Master discussed statute of limitations issues, including equitable tolling. He also directed respondent to review the case. (ds2, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 7 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Order Reassigning Case Special Master
                                              ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Master John F. Edwards. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 6 Filed: 7/17/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Pearlman for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/17/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 5 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Order
                                                  ORDER: Parties shall file a joint status report by 10/12/07. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 4 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/18/2007 Affidavit
                                                    AFFIDAVIT by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO. Service: 7/9/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 7/16/2007, Entered: 7/17/2007 Order
                                                      ORDER re Petitioner shall confer with respondent and then contact the court by 8/03/07, to suggest three possible dates and times for the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 2 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Gary Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 1 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: 7/9/2007 Petition
                                                          PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066802) [Vaccination date: 6/28/07], filed by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO.Respondents Report due by 10/4/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                                            LREF

                                                            Statistics

                                                            This case has been viewed 120 times.

                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                            Space
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                             
                                                            PlainSite
                                                            Sign Up
                                                            Need Password Help?