MOJICA et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00376-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JOSHUA ACEVEDO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
No Logo JULIO ACEVEDO, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
No Logo YLUMINADA MOJICA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by BRITCHER, LEONE & ROTH LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MINDY MICHAELS ROTH +1 201 444 1644 mindy@medmalnj.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Heather Lynn Pearlman +1 202 353 2699 heather.pearlman2@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Statistical Closing
County None
Terminated 8/21/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 5 Filed: 8/21/2007, Entered: 8/21/2007
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that the petition is dismissed as a duplicate to the case filed under docket number 07-501V. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 4 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/22/2007 DECISION of Special Master
    DECISION Signed by Special Master John F. Edwards. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/23/2007 Remark
      Remark [4] Decision sent to Petitioner via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery 7/19/07, by the Clerk. Tracking no. 8619-2827-7660. (tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/22/2007 Remark
        Remark. The clerk of court shall refund to petitioners the filing fee associated with this case. (tjk, )
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/19/2007
          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master John F. Edwards : A Status Conference was held on July 18, 2007. Ms. Mindy Michaels Roth appeared via telephone for petitioner. Mr. Vincent Matanoski appeared via telephone for respondent. The Special Master discussed that the case is a duplicate of 07-501 and discussed dismissal. (ds2, )
            LREF
            Blank 3 Filed: 7/18/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Notice of Appearance/
            NOTICE of Appearance by Heather Lynn Pearlman for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/18/07.(tjk, )
              LREF
              Blank 2 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Notice Of Assignment
              NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master John Edwards. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 1 Filed: 7/13/2007, Entered: 7/16/2007 Petition
                PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066841) [Vaccination date: 6/28/04], filed by YLUMINADA MOJICA, JULIO ACEVEDO, JOSHUA ACEVEDO.Respondents Report due by 10/15/2007.(Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 87 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?