SHARP et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00547-GWM
District Judge George W. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo IVA DEAN ROGERS, Plaintiff

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, Plaintiff

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
No Logo PATRICIA R. SHARP, Plaintiff

Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Judgment
County None
Terminated 6/12/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags APPEAL, CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 27 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Notice of Appeal
NOTICE OF APPEAL, filed by USA. Copies to judge, opposing party and CAFC. (hw1, )
    LREF
    Legal Document 26 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008
    CERTIFIED TRANSCRIPT OF JUDGMENT, forwarded to Edward Robert Reines. (bre, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 25 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
      JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the plaintiff, Patricia R. Sharp recover of and from the United States damages in the amount of $73,953.40 for the period beginning October 1, 2004, and ending June 30, 2008; Plaintiff, Margaret M. Haverkamp shall recover of and from the United States damages in the amount of $46,334.00 for the period beginning February 1, 2005, and ending June 30, 2008; and plaintiff, Iva Dean Rogers shall recover of and from the United States damages in the amount of $32,379.00 for the period beginning January 1, 2004, and ending June 30, 2008. (lld)
        LREF
        Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008 Court Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER granting [20] Motion for Summary Judgment. This opinion is PUBLISHED. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment as described in the opinion and order. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
          LREF
          Legal Document 23 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008
          REPLY to Response to Motion re [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by PATRICIA R. SHARP, MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, IVA DEAN ROGERS. (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
            LREF
            Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/19/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008
            RESPONSE to [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by USA.Reply due by 6/5/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit David P. Smith, Acting Deputy Chief Financial Officer DOD, # (2) Exhibit DOD FMR documents attached to Smith Declaration)(Mickle, Douglas)
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008
            STIPULATION re [20] MOTION for Summary Judgment List of Stipulated Facts, filed by all parties. (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
              LREF
              Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: 4/18/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion for Summary Judgment
              MOTION for Summary Judgment, filed by PATRICIA R. SHARP, MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, IVA DEAN ROGERS.Response due by 5/19/2008.(Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
                LREF
                Legal Document 19 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008
                ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 4/21/2008.(Mickle, Douglas)
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 2/27/2008
                  ORDER granting [18] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 2/29/2008. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/26/2008, Terminated: 2/27/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/29/2008 to File Answer re [17] Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Published Opinion, filed by USA.Response due by 3/14/2008.(Mickle, Douglas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Court Filing
                      PUBLISHED OPINION denying [5] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6); defendant's answer due by 2/26/2008. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Court Filing
                        TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-81_ held on January 30, 2008 before Judge George W. Miller. (dw1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 15 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER identifying additional question for oral argument. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 14 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Court Filing
                            ORDER Setting Oral Argument on [5] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) and providing notice of questions to be addressed by parties at oral argument: Oral Argument set for 1/30/2008 at 9:30 AM in National Courts Building before Judge George W. Miller. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 13 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007
                              SUR-REPLY re [10] MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Def App pages 110-111)(Mickle, Douglas)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [10] Motion for Leave to File Plaintiffs' Surreply Brief. Defendant's Response to Surreply Brief due by 12/18/2007. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                  SUR-REPLY re [5] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by PATRICIA R. SHARP, MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, IVA DEAN ROGERS. (Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/4/2007 Motion for Leave to File
                                    MOTION for Leave to File Surreply Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by PATRICIA R. SHARP, MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, IVA DEAN ROGERS.Response due by 12/20/2007.(Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [5] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Part I# (2) Appendix Part II# (3) Appendix Part III# (4) Appendix Part IV)(Mickle, Douglas)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                        ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply as to [6] Response to Motion. Reply due by 11/13/2007. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/8/2007, Entered: 11/8/2007, Terminated: 11/9/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 13, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [6] Response to Motion,,, filed by USA.Response due by 11/26/2007.(Mickle, Douglas)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007, Terminated: 10/29/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
                                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2007 to File Response or Reply as to [6] Response to Motion,,, filed by USA.Response due by 11/16/2007.(Mickle, Douglas)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                                              ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re [6] Response to Motion to Dismiss. Defendant's Reply in support of [5] Motion to Dismiss due by 11/8/2007. Signed by Judge George W. Miller. (ck)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                RESPONSE to [5] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Plaintiffs' Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, filed by PATRICIA R. SHARP, MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, IVA DEAN ROGERS.Reply due by 11/1/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Exhibit 1# (2) Appendix Exhibit 2 Part 1# (3) Appendix Exhibit 2 Part 2# (4) Appendix Exhibit 2 Part 3# (5) Appendix Exhibit 3# (6) Appendix Exhibits 4 to 6)(Hadzimehmedovic, Azra)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: 9/17/2007, Terminated: 2/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                                  MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), filed by USA.Response due by 10/18/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1-3 of Defendant's Appendix# (2) Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Defendant's Appendix# (3) Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part A Defendant's Appendix# (4) Exhibit Exhibit 5 Part B Defendant's Appendix# (5) Exhibit Exhibits 6-8 Defendant's Appendix# (6) Exhibit Exhibit 9 Defendant's Appendix)(Mickle, Douglas)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. (Mickle, Douglas)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge George W. Miller. (hw1, )
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 7/19/2007, Entered: 7/20/2007 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066870), filed by PATRICIA R. SHARP, MARGARET M. HAVERKAMP, IVA DEAN ROGERS.Answer due by 9/17/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(hw1, )
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 157 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?