ABRAHAM, et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00558-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo JACQUELINE ABRAHAM, Plaintiff
No Logo RICHARD ABRAHAM, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Frank D'Alessandris +1 202 307 0139 +1 202 514 8624 david.d'alessandris@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 7/24/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $169000
Nature of Suit 214 - Tax - Informer's Fees
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 7/15/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 31 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, filed by all parties. Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 30 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008 Court Filing
    ORDER granting [29] Motion to Stay Proceedings. Status Report or Joint Stipulation of Dismissal due by 7/21/2008. Signed by Judge Charles F. Lettow for Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
      LREF
      Blank 29 Filed: 6/20/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008, Terminated: 6/24/2008 Terminated:
      MOTION to Stay Proceedings (until July 21, 2008), filed by USA. Service: 6/20/08. Response due by 7/7/2008.(dls)
        LREF
        Blank 28 Filed: 5/30/2008, Entered: 6/8/2008 Response to Motion
        RESPONSE to [24] MOTION to Amend Pleadings - Rule 15 [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Reply due by 6/13/2008. Service: 5/30/08.(dls)
          LREF
          Blank 27 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/8/2008 Status Report
          Preliminary STATUS REPORT, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/27/08.(dls)
            LREF
            Blank 26 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/8/2008 Response
            RESPONSE to plaintiffs' emergency motion for speedy trial, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/19/08.(dls)
              LREF
              Blank 25 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/26/2008 Joint Preliminary Status Report
              Plaintiffs' JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 5/13/08.(dls)
                LREF
                Blank 24 Filed: 5/20/2008, Entered: 5/26/2008 Terminated:
                MOTION to Amend [1] Complaint, filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM, JACQUELINE ABRAHAM [by leave of the judge] Service: 5/13/08. Response due by 5/30/2008.(dls)
                  LREF
                  Blank 23 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Response to Motion
                  RESPONSE to [22] MOTION to Amend, etc., filed by USA. Reply due by 5/22/2008. Service: 5/8/08.(dls)
                    LREF
                    Blank 22 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Terminated:
                    MOTION to Amend and to clarify monies owed by the IRS, United States to the plaintiffs should this case proceed further, filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM, JACQUELINE ABRAHAM [by leave of the judge]. Service: 4/21/08. Response due by 5/8/2008.(dls)
                      LREF
                      Blank 21 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER setting schedule following the April 14, 2008, telephone conference: the government will depose plaintiffs on June 24, 2008; and a telephone conference is scheduled for 7/9/2008 at 2:00 PM (EDT) before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                        LREF
                        Blank 20 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER, pursuant to RCFC 19(a)(2), joining Jacqueline Abraham as a plaintiff. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
                          Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 4/14/2008 before Judge Susan G. Braden: Scheduling Conference regarding discovery. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(jw)
                            LREF
                            Blank 19 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008
                            ANSWER and AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES to [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 4/7/2008.JPSR due by 5/30/2008.(hw1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 18 Filed: 4/1/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008 Status Conference OrderCourt Filing
                              STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference rescheduled for 4/14/2008 at 3:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                                LREF
                                Blank 17 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                NOTICE re: Defendant's Opposition, filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM [by leave of the judge]. Copy to defendant. (dls)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 16 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Response to Motion
                                  RESPONSE to [15] MOTION to Transfer to District Court in Boston, filed by USA [by leave of the judge]. Reply due by 3/31/2008. Service: 3/17/08.(dls)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 15 Filed: 3/26/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Terminated:
                                    [Emergency] MOTION to Transfer to District Court in Boston, filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM [by leave of the judge]. Service: 2/28/08. Response due by 3/17/2008.(dls)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 14 Filed: 3/25/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 ~Notice (other)
                                      Notice re: clarification of Summary Judgment Motion, filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM [by leave of the judge]. Copy to defendant. (dls)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 13 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Order on Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6)Court Filing
                                        PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER DENYING [8] Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6); DENYING [9] Cross Motion, and scheduling a status conference on April 1, 2008 at 2:00 p.m. EDT. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                          Set Deadline: Status Conference set for 4/1/2008 at 2:00 PM before Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 12 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Affidavit
                                            AFFIDAVIT in support of [9] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [8] Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and (6), a Court Ruling on the Motion, or Speedy Trial by RICHARD ABRAHAM filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 2/8/08.(dls)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 11 Filed: 12/27/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Affidavit
                                              AFFIDAVIT of Richard Abraham in support of [9] CROSS MOTION filed [by leave of the judge]. Service: 12/17/07.(dls)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 10 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Response to Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                RESPONSE to [9] Omnibus Motion and REPLY to Response to [8] Motion to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and(6), filed by USA. Reply due by 12/31/2007. Service: 12/14/07.(dls)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 9 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007 Terminated:
                                                  OMNIBUS MOTION (i.e. motion for summary judgment) and RESPONSE to [8] Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(6), Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1) filed by USA, filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM. Service: 10/31/2007.Response due by 12/17/2007.(mb2) Modified on 12/19/2007 to edit docket text. (Samler, Debbie).
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 8 Filed: 10/23/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Terminated:
                                                    MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6), MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 10/23/2007. Response due by 11/23/2007.(mb2)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 7 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007
                                                      ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 10/24/2007.(signed by the Clerk) (dls)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank 6 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: 9/25/2007, Terminated: 9/25/2007 Terminated:
                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 10/24/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA. Service: 9/14/07.(dls)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 5 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Letter
                                                          Letter from Richard Abraham, dated July 30, 2007, filed [by leave of the judge]. Copy to defendant. (dls)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 4 Filed: 8/7/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 OrderCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER directing the Clerk to file plaintiff's July 30, 2007 letter and to serve a copy on defendant; and reminding plaintiff that any documents he wishes to have considered by the court need to be filed with the Clerk pursuant to the court's rules. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (dls)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 3 Filed: 8/6/2007, Entered: 8/10/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by David Frank D'Alessandris for USA. Service: 8/6/07.(dls)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 2 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (mb2)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 7/24/2007, Entered: 7/25/2007 Complaint
                                                                  COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066889), filed by RICHARD ABRAHAM. Answer due by 9/24/2007.(mb2)
                                                                    LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 171 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?