NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY D/B/A XCEL ENERGY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00608-JPW
District Judge John P. Wiese, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY D/B/A XCEL ENERGY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Alexander D. Tomaszczuk +1 703 770 7940 +1 703 770 7901 alex.tomaszczuk@pillsburylaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew P. Averbach +1 202 353 0527 +1 202 305 2118 andrew.averbach@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/15/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case
Related Case
198-cv-00484-JPW
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
RESPONSE to [13] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY D/B/A XCEL ENERGY.Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Chu, Jack)
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
    MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [11] Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
        LREF
        Legal Document 11 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008, Terminated: 1/8/2008 Motion to Stay
        MOTION to Stay all proceedings pending resolution of appeals, filed by USA.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Averbach, Andrew)
          LREF
          Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Answer due by 1/4/2008. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (jwg)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 12/19/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/4/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 12/31/2007.(Averbach, Andrew)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: 10/16/2007
              ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer due by 12/14/2007. (vro)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/15/2007, Entered: 10/15/2007, Terminated: 10/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 12/14/2007 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 11/1/2007.(Averbach, Andrew)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/11/2007, Entered: 9/11/2007
                  NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew P. Averbach for USA. (Averbach, Andrew)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge John P. Wiese (vro)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                        NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [98-484], filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY D/B/A XCEL ENERGY. Service: 8/15/2007.(vro)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                          Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY D/B/A XCEL ENERGY. Service: 8/15/2007.(vro)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 8/15/2007, Entered: 8/17/2007 Complaint
                            COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 066989), filed by NORTHERN STATES POWER COMPANY D/B/A XCEL ENERGY.Answer due by 10/15/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(vro)
                            LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 233 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?