RAMIREZ et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00621-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by mbllc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph A Mooneyham +1 864 421 0036 +1 864 421 9060 joe@mbllc.com
No Logo ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by mbllc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph A Mooneyham +1 864 421 0036 +1 864 421 9060 joe@mbllc.com
No Logo FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by mbllc.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph A Mooneyham +1 864 421 0036 +1 864 421 9060 joe@mbllc.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Carr Esposito +1 202 514 9729 +1 202 616 4310 katherine.esposito@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 8/20/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (21) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 8/28/2008, Entered: 9/3/2008 Joint Status Report
JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/28/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008 Description not available
    SCHEDULING ORDER: The parties shall file a joint report due by 8/28/2008, detailing the parties progress with informally resolving this matter. If the parties are unable to informally resolve this matter by 8/28/08, the parties shall contact the court with three proposed dates and times to set up a status conference. Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 7/29/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Joint Status Report
      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/29/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Description not available
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 7/28/2008 Signed by Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 7/1/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Joint Status Report
          JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 6/27/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 5/27/2008, Entered: 5/30/2008 Status Report
            Joint STATUS REPORT, filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 5/27/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 4/25/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Joint Status Report
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Status Report
                STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/24/08.(tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Medical Records
                  NOTICE OF FILING: MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s)#9 -Shriners Hospital] filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS. Service: 2/22/08.(tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008 Status Report/Order
                    STATUS REPORT ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report in 60 days, by no later than 3/25/08, detailing the parties progress with informally resolving this matter. The parties shall file an additional Joint Status Report every 30 days thereafter. If the parties are unable to informally resolve this matter after the filing of two additional Joint Status Reports the parties shall contact the court with three proposed dates and times to set-up a status conference. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Joint Status Report
                      JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/11/08.(tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                        ORDER granting [6] Motion to SUSPEND the deadline of respondent's Rule 4(c) Report. The parties shall submit by no later than 1/14/08, a status report detailing the parties progress with informally resolving this matter Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007, Terminated: 11/27/2007 Terminated:
                          MOTION Respondent's Motion To Suspend Rule 4 (c) Report Deadline., filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/19/07.Response due by 12/6/2007. (Neal, Alonzo)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 10/5/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : Status Conference held on 10/03/07 to answer initial questions from petitioner's counsel and also to get the respondent's view on the completeness of the record. No new Order issued from status conference. Respondent's R(4) Report due 11/23/07. (co)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 9/10/2007, Entered: 9/13/2007 Remark
                              Remark. 3 copies of the petition's original records received by the court, re-filed by petitioner. Copy to Chambers, DOJ and the Office of the Clerk. [Certificate of mailing - received on 9/17/07]
                                LREF
                                Blank 5 Filed: 9/7/2007, Entered: 9/10/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Carr Esposito for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 9/07/07.(tjk, )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 4 Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: 8/29/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Alexis B Babcock for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 8/28/07.(tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 3 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: 8/28/2007 Order
                                    ORDER re Petitioner shall confer with respondent and then contact the court by 9/20/07, to suggest three possible dates and times for the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 2 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 1 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Petition
                                        PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067101) [Vaccination date: 10/29/05], filed by AUREALIO LEAL RAMIREZ, ESTHELA ROSAS COVARRUBIAS, FREDDIE LEAL ROSAS. Respondents Report due by 11/23/2007.(tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: 8/23/2007 Remark
                                          Remark: Petition filed with one set of records, unbound, unpaginated, two copies missing, exhibits #1-8. (tjk, )
                                            LREF

                                            Statistics

                                            This case has been viewed 206 times.

                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                            Space
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                             
                                            PlainSite
                                            Sign Up
                                            Need Password Help?