WRIGHT v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00668-CCM
District Judge Christine O.C. Miller, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RODNEY LEON WRIGHT, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Courtney Elizabeth Sheehan +1 202 353 7995 courtney.sheehan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 9/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $150000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 4/8/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 22 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Order on Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)Court Filing
ORDER denying [19] Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [17] Published Opinion/Order Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (bre, )
    LREF
    Blank 21 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008 Response to Motion
    RESPONSE to [19] MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [17] Published Opinion/Order, filed by USA. Service: 4/30/2008.(hw1, )
      LREF
      Blank 20 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER directing defendant to file its Response to [19] Motion for Reconsideration by 4/30/2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich for Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dls)
        LREF
        Blank 19 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008, Terminated: 5/9/2008 Motion for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a)
        MOTION for Reconsideration - Rule 59(a) re [17] Published Opinion/Order by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT filed [by leave of the judge]. Copy to defendant.(dls)
          LREF
          Blank 18 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the complaint is dismissed pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(1) without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. (lld)
            LREF
            Blank 17 Filed: 4/7/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008 Published Opinion/OrderCourt Filing
            PUBLISHED MEMORANDUM OPINION The Clerk is directed to dismiss the complaint pursuant to RCFC 12(b)(1) without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. No costs. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (lld)
              LREF
              Blank 16 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/31/2008 Response
              RESPONSE to the filing of Administrative Record, filed by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE] Service: 3/19/2008.(bre, )
                LREF
                Blank 15 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008
                ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. Service: 3/17/2008.(hw1, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 14 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/18/2008
                  NOTICE of filing ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA Service: 3/17/2008.(hw1, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 13 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER directing defendant to file a copy of the Administrative Record as soon as practicable. Signed by Acting Chief Judge Nancy B. Firestone for Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (dls)
                      LREF
                      Blank 12 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Reply to Response to Motion
                      REPLY to Response to Motion re [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. Service: 2/11/2008.(bre, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 11 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER Re: Plaintiff is reminded that he must attach a certificate of service, pursuant to, RCFC 5(a) and (b), to every document that he submits for filing. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (bre, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 10 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008
                          ADDITION TO RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 2/28/2008. (bre, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 9 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                            RESPONSE to [8] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT. [FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 2/19/2008. (bre, )
                              LREF
                              Blank 8 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) and 12(b)(6), filed by USA. Service: 1/14/2008.Response due by 2/14/2008.(bre,)
                                LREF
                                Blank 7 Filed: 11/29/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007
                                RESPONSE to [5] MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2008 to respond to complaint, filed by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT.[FILED BY LEAVE OF THE JUDGE]Reply due by 12/13/2007. (bre,)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 6 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting [5] Motion for Extension of Time; granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperisDefendant shall respond to the complaint by 1/14/2008. Signed by Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (bre,)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2008 to respond to complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 11/30/2007.(Sheehan, Courtney)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 4 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/5/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Elizabeth Sheehan for USA. Service: 10/4/2007.(hw1, )
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 3 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller. (mij, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 2 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Terminated:
                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT. Service: 9/13/2007.Response due by 10/1/2007.(mij, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: 9/14/2007 Complaint
                                            COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $250), filed by RODNEY LEON WRIGHT.Answer due by 11/13/2007.(mij, )
                                              LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 172 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?