SERCO INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00691-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Serco Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by petrillopowell.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph James Petrillo +1 202 887 4848 +1 202 478 1656 jp@petrillopowell.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eric Chadwick +1 202 616 0476 +1 202 305 7644 kyle.chadwick@usdoj.gov
No Logo Advanced Technology Systems, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Lee Moorhouse +1 703 749 1311 moorhouser@gtlaw.com
No Logo Apptis, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Artel Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ARTEL, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by PILIEROMAZZA PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Dearborn, III +1 202 857 1000 +1 202 857 0200 pdearborn@pilieromazza.com
No Logo Centech Group, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo CGI Federal Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oldaker Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia H. Wittie +1 202 496 3493 +1 202 293 6111 pwittie@obblaw.com
No Logo NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rotundalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger A Briney +1 202 777 3648 +1 202 777 3649 rogerbriney@rotundalaw.com
No Logo Stg, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by POMPAN, MURRAY & WERFEL, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald H. Werfel +1 703 739 1340 ghwerfel@pompanmurray.com
Electronic Data Systems Electronic Data Systems, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Daniel R. Forman +1 202 624 2504 +1 202 628 5116 dforman@crowell.com
General Dynamics Corporation General Dynamics Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "General Dynamics One Source, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Churchill +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dchurchill@jenner.com
No Logo Indus Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Thomas Welch +1 703 226 1868 +1 703 566 6540 WWelch@generalcounsellaw.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES"
Officer/Director, Unison Software, Inc.
Officer/Director, Crossworlds Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Humphrey +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 thumphrey@crowell.com
No Logo STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by MCMANUS, DARDEN & FELSEN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Leslie Schor +1 202 296 9260 +1 202 659 3732 sschor@msadlaw.com
Office COFC
Filed 9/26/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 3/3/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
107-cv-00691-FMA None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, LEAD, PROTO
  Entries (187) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 174 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008 Court Filing
PUBLISHED OPINION. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
    LREF
    Legal Document 173 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
    NOTICE, filed by USA Supplemental Notice of Requested Redactions (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Vohra, Anuj)
      LREF
      Legal Document 172 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
      NOTICE, filed by Indus Corporation Request for Redactions (Welch, William)
        LREF
        Legal Document 171 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
        NOTICE, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES re [166] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record, Sealed Opinion,, and Request for Correction of Counsel of Record (Forman, Daniel)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 170 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
          **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by all plaintiffs re [166] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record, Sealed Opinion,, Proposed Redactions (Wittie, Patricia)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 169 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
            **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC., re [166] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record, Sealed Opinion,, (Schor, Susan)
              LREF
              Legal Document 168 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008
              NOTICE, filed by USA re [166] Order on Motion for Summary Judgment on the Admin. Record, Sealed Opinion,, Concerning Proposed Redactions (Chadwick, Kyle)
                LREF
                Sealed Legal Document 167 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
                **SEALED**JUDGMENT (lld)
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 166 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Court Filing
                  **SEALED**SEALED OPINION: granting in part and denying in part plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record; and granting in part and denying in part defendant's cross motion for judgment on the administraive. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 165 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/12/2008 TranscriptCourt Filing
                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (pages 1-334) held on February 4, 2008 before Judge Francis M. Allegra. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 164 Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008, Terminated: 2/1/2008 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                      Joint MOTION for Leave to File Attached Memorandum of Case Law Out of Time, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES.Response due by 2/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Case Law)(Humphrey, Thomas)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 2/1/2008, Entered: 2/1/2008
                        ORDER denying [164] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 163 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER ON ORAL ARGUMENT. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 162 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 1/31/2008
                            MEMORANDUM re: [158] Order,, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Moorhouse, Richard)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 161 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                              NOTICE, filed by USA re [149] Order, (Attachments: # (1))(Chadwick, Kyle)
                                LREF
                                Sealed Legal Document 160 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to [149] Order, Plaintiffs' Joint Response and Attachment, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.(Wittie, Patricia)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 159 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                  APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Paul R. Hugo, filed by APPTIS INC.,. (Conway, Richard)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 158 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Court Filing
                                    ORDER directing the parties to each file a short memorandum listing any cases involving a procurement in which ratings to the thousandths of a point. Memorandum due by 2:00 p.m. (EST) on 2/1/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 157 Filed: 1/29/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008
                                      STATUS REPORT Concerning Allocations of Time for Oral Argument, filed by USA. (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 156 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008, Terminated: 1/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                        MOTION for Extension of Time until 1/29/08 to Time to File Joint Report Regarding Oral Argument, filed by USA.Response due by 2/14/2008.(Vohra, Anuj)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank -- Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008
                                          ORDER granting [156] Motion for Extension of TimeStatus Report due by 1/29/2007 Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                            LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 155 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
                                            **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions, filed by USA.(Chadwick, Kyle)
                                              LREF
                                              Sealed Legal Document 154 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
                                              **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, filed by INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES.(Humphrey, Thomas)
                                                LREF
                                                Sealed Legal Document 153 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008
                                                **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS.(Forman, Daniel)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 152 Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
                                                  STATUS REPORT Response to Order on Oral Argument, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Sealed Legal Document 151 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
                                                    **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Revised Indicies to Administrative Record (Attachments: # (1) Revised Indices to the Administrative Record)(Vohra, Anuj)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Sealed Legal Document 150 Filed: 1/23/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008
                                                      **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Affidavit of Steven J. Kempf)(Vohra, Anuj)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 149 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                        ORDER: Plaintiffs, defendant, defendant-intervenors IBM and EDS, shall file a flowchart detailing each of the steps in the process that was employed to derive the weighted average BCP/PP socre. Notice of Compliance due by 1/30/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                          LREF
                                                          Legal Document 148 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                                          ORDER: Defendant shall provide an affidavit from an appropriate official, describing the scoring adjustments that led Stanley Assoc., Inc. to receive an award. Notice of Compliance due by 1/23/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                            LREF
                                                            Legal Document 147 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                            ORDER: This court scheduled oral argument in this matter for February 4, 2008. To ensure argument proceeds fairly and efficiently, provisions shall be observed by the parties. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document 146 Filed: 1/16/2008, Entered: 1/16/2008 Court Filing
                                                              ORDER Striking: On October 9, 2007, through November 19, 2007, defendant produced the administrative record on CD-ROM. The CD-ROMs, produced on October 31, 2007, and thereafter, fail to provide adequate subject matter descriptions in their indices. On or before January 23, 2008, defendant shall file new indices for those CD-ROMs. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank -- Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/15/2008
                                                                ORDER granting [144] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Legal Document 145 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER directing defendant to produce documents for in camera review. Notice of Compliance due by 1/15/2008 by 5:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 144 Filed: 1/14/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008, Terminated: 1/15/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                    **SEALED** MOTION to Amend/Correct Reply to Defendants Consolidated Cross Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Opposition To All Plaintiffs Motions For Judgment on The Administrative Record and Reply To All Cross Motions and Oppositions Filed By Intervenor Defendants, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC..Response due by 1/31/2008. (Attachments: # (1))(Martin, Kenneth)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 143 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                      **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC..Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Martin, Kenneth)
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 142 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                        **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [124] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 141 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                          **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [124] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions, RESPONSE and reply to [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [124] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions, filed by STG, INC..Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 140 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [124] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions and Reply in Support of Apptis, Inc.'s Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by APPTIS INC.,.Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 139 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                              **SEALED**REPLY to Response to Motion re [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [124] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions Consolidated Plaintiff Nortel Government Solutions Incorporated's Reply to Defendant's and Defendant-Intervenors' Cross Motions for Judgment on the Administrative Record and Reply in Support of Its Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.(Briney, Roger)
                                                                                LREF
                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 138 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [124] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions for Judgment on the Record, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED.Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 137 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                  **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions and Reply to Oppositions, filed by SERCO INC..Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document 136 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA re [131] Order, (Attachments: # (1) Stanley contract# (2) Stanely financial# (3) Stanley clearance# (4) Stanley SBA)(Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 135 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/11/2008
                                                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE and reply to [123] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions by Defendant United States, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Reply due by 1/28/2008.(Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document 134 Filed: 1/10/2008, Entered: 1/10/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting [132] Motion to Intervene. Stanley Assoc., Inc. shall not file any briefs in this matter without seeking leave of the court. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 133 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Complaint For Public Release, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC..Response due by 1/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1))(Martin, Kenneth)
                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document 132 Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008, Terminated: 1/10/2008 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.(Schor, Susan)
                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document 131 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008 Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER directing defendant to produce any documents related to its award of a contract to Stanley Assoc., Inc. that it has not already provided. Notice of Compliance due by 1/11/2008. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                              MOTION to Amend/Correct [113] Redacted Document, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 1/25/2008.(Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 129 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                **SEALED** MOTION to Seal Document [119] Redacted Document, [105] Motion for Judgment on the Record of STG, Inc., filed by STG, INC..Response due by 1/25/2008. (Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                  MOTION to Seal Document [115] Redacted Document MOTION TO PLACE UNDER SEAL PREVIOUSLY FILED PUBLIC VERSION OF PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD AND FOR LEAVE TO FILE CORRECTED PUBLIC VERSION, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Response due by 1/25/2008.(Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 127 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                    **SEALED**Joint MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record and Memorandum, filed by SERCO INC..Response due by 1/22/2008. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Blank -- Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008
                                                                                                      ORDER granting [126] Motion to Amend/Correct Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 126 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/26/2007, Terminated: 1/2/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                                                                        **SEALED** MOTION to Amend/Correct [125] CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADCROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by AD, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES.Response due by 1/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibits 1 through 5)(McCarthy, John)
                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 125 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Cross Motion [Dispositive]
                                                                                                          **SEALED** CROSS MOTION and RESPONSE to [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record filed by SERCO INC., [102] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, [93] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC., [105] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by STG, INC., [103] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by APPTIS INC.,, [98] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,, [96] Motion for Judgment on the Record filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED, [100] Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS, INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES.Response due by 1/22/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum)(McCarthy, John) Modified on 12/26/2007 to indicate document is sealed. (Samler, Debbie).
                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document 124 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record AND OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR JUDGMENT ON ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by Indus Corporation.Response due by 1/22/2008.(Welch, William)
                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 123 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                              **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions, filed by USA.Response due by 1/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Addendum -- AR Citations for Exhibit Cs)(Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document 122 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC., (Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document 121 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC. Motion for Judgment on Pleading Public Version (Martin, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document 120 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC. of filing of Revised Redacted Complaint for Public Release (Martin, Kenneth)
                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document 119 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007
                                                                                                                      REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by STG, INC. redacting [105] Motion for Judgment on the Record of STG, Inc.. (Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document 118 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/14/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record Agreed Upon Redacted Copy May Be Made Public, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.Response due by 1/14/2008.(Briney, Roger)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document 117 Filed: 12/13/2007, Entered: 12/13/2007
                                                                                                                          REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by APPTIS INC., redacting [104] Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document 116 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007
                                                                                                                            REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC., redacting [100] Motion for Judgment on the Record and Memorndum in Support. (Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document 115 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007
                                                                                                                              REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC., redacting [108] MOTION for Leave to File Attached Memorandum of Points and Authorities Out of Time Redacted Memorandum in Support. (Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 114 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                                                                                                                                REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED redacting [97] Memorandum re: Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. (Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 113 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                                                                                                                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC. redacting [94] Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: # (1))(Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 112 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/10/2007
                                                                                                                                  REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by SERCO INC. redacting [91] Memorandum re Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 111 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Change of Address by Richard Lee Moorhouse (Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 110 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                                                                                                                      **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [100] Motion for Judgment on the Record,, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. (Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting [108] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 109 Filed: 12/5/2007, Entered: 12/5/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Substitute Attorney Daniel R. Forman in place of John E. McCarthy, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS.Response due by 12/24/2007.(McCarthy, John)
                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 108 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Attached Memorandum of Points and Authorities Out of Time, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Response due by 12/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum of Points and Authorities)(Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 107 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                                                                                                                              **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SERCO INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Errata Memorandum cover sheet protected)(Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Striking [106] Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support. Plaintiff, CGI shall file an appropriate motion out of time immediately. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 106 Filed: 12/2/2007, Entered: 12/2/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Response due by 12/20/2007. (Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 105 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record of STG, Inc., filed by STG, INC..Response due by 12/17/2007. (Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 104 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support, filed by APPTIS INC.,.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Second Part of Memorandum)(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 103 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by APPTIS INC.,.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 102 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2) # (3) # (4))(Briney, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 101 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Puja Satiani, filed by INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES. (Humphrey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 100 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record and Memorndum in Support, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Supplement Second Part Motion for Judgment on the Record and Memorandum in Support# (2) Supplement Certificat of Electronic Filing)(Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 99 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 98 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 97 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [96] Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED. (Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 96 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED.Response due by 12/17/2007. (Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 95 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record Certificate of Filing, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 12/17/2007. (Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 94 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record Memorandum in Support, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 12/17/2007. (Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 93 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 12/17/2007. (Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 92 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED**STATEMENT OF FACTS re: [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SERCO INC.. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 91 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [90] Motion for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SERCO INC.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 90 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SERCO INC..Response due by 01/02/2008. (Petrillo, Joseph) Modified on 12/3/2007 (Hitch, Jessica).
                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
                                                                                                                                                                                    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Response due by 1/2/2008. (jyh)
                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 89 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [84] MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record in No. 07-691C, filed by USA.Reply due by 12/10/2007. (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 88 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [84] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record,, filed by SERCO INC.. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 87 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER directing defendant to file a response to the motion to supplement the administrative record. Response due by 11/28/2007,5:30 p.m.(EST). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank -- Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [84] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record. Having reviewed plaintiff Serco's motion and defendant's response, the court believes that the motion falls within the narrow set of circumstances in which supplementation is appropriate. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 86 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [84] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record,, filed by SERCO INC.. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 85 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [84] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record,, filed by SERCO INC.. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 84 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/27/2007, Terminated: 11/28/2007 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by SERCO INC..Response due by 12/14/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Dirk B. Smith# (2) Affidavit Declaration of J. Bondugula)(Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 83 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to [82] Order Striking Document, Revised Statement of Issues, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.(Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 82 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Striking [77] statement of issues filed by Stanley Associates, Inc. as it does not comply with the order issued.Statement of issues due 11/27/2007, by 9:00 a.m.(EST). Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 81 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED.(Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 80 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.(Briney, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 79 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.(Briney, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 78 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by APPTIS INC.,.(Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 77 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.(Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 76 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Administrative Record in No. 07-803C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 75 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.(Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 74 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED**RESPONSE to [51] Order, Statement of Issues, filed by STG, INC..(Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 73 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        **SEALED**RESPONSE to Statement of Issues, filed by SERCO INC..(Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 72 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER: This order hereby extended to a new consolidated case, No. 07-803C who now is automatically subject to the terms of that order and are entitled to access to protected information, without further action. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 71 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**RESPONSE to Statement of Issues, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. (Attachments: # (1))(Moorhouse, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 70 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/19/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 12:00 p.m., 11/19/2007. Plaintiff, The Centech Group additional documents to be added to administrative record due by 12:00 p.m., 11/20/2007. Defendant, additional-designated agency materials, due by 5:30 p.m., 11/23/2007. Plaintiff, The Centech Group, Statement of Issues due by 11/26/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 69 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE, filed by USA Concerning Nortel Designations (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank -- Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [67] Motion for Leave to File Out of Time Portion of Administrative Record. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 68 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER: Any objection to or comment on proposed case management plan due by 5:30 pm on 11/16/2007.Notice of Compliance due by 11/16/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 67 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007, Terminated: 11/16/2007 Motion for Leave to File Out of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Attached Portion of Administrative Record Out of Time, filed by USA.Response due by 12/3/2007. (Attachments: # (1) AR 5506a - 5506h)(Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 66 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying [58] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 65 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record Designation of Additional Documents for the Administrative Record, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.Response due by 12/3/2007. (Briney, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 64 Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED**MEMORANDUM re: [58] Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED. (Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 11/14/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [63] Motion for Extension of Time to File Designation of Additional Documents for the Administrative Record. Additional Documents for Administrative Record due by 11/14/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 63 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007, Terminated: 11/14/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Extension of Time until 11/14/2007 to Filing of Designation of Additional Documents for the Administrative Record, filed by NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED.Response due by 11/30/2007.(Briney, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 62 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/13/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing in No. 07-776C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 61 Filed: 11/12/2007, Entered: 11/12/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER Memorandum from plaintiff Artel, Inc. due by noon on 11/14/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 60 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE, filed by USA (corrected caption) (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 59 Filed: 11/9/2007, Entered: 11/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Administrative Record in No. 07-771C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 58 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007, Terminated: 11/14/2007 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED**First MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED.Response due by 11/26/2007. (Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 57 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record (Designation of Additional Documents), filed by ARTEL, INCORPORATED.Response due by 11/26/2007. (Dearborn, Philip)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 56 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by APPTIS INC.,.Response due by 11/26/2007. (Conway, Richard)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 55 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Previously, On November 2, 2007, this court issued a scheduling order for this matter. That scheduling order is hereby modified to include the following provisions. In accordance with prior practice in this proceeding, the court shall treat the defendant-intervenors in the consolidated action as having intervened in case No. 07-771C. Defendant Administrative Record (CD-ROM verson)due by 5:30 p.m.(EST)11/9/2007. Plaintiffs, CGI Federal, Inc, and STG, Inc, shall file their designation of additional documents due by 5:30 p.m. (EST)11/13/2007, 5:30 p.m. (EST). Defendant shall produce the additional-designated agency materials due by 5:30 p.m. 11/16/07. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 54 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER: This order hereby extended to a new consolidated case, No. 07-771C who now is automatically subject to the terms of that order and are entitled to access to protected information, without further action. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 53 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA of Pagination Error (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 52 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Any objection to or comment by party on the proposed case management plan due by 4:00 pm EST 11/7/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 51 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER: Scheduling order previously filed on November 2, 2007 omitted a deadline and is hereby modified. On or before November 19, 2007, plaintiffs shall each file a statement of issues. Statement of Issues due by 11/19/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 50 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA of Filings in Nos. 07-760C, -761C, -766C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 49 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE, filed by USA of Filings in Nos. 07-741C and -747C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 48 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Supplemental Administrative Record (CD-ROM version)due by 11/5/2007 by 5:30 p.m. (EST). Plaintiffs, Artel; Advanced Technology Systems, Inc, and Apptis, Inc., shall filed designations of additional documents due by 11/7/2007. Defendant shall produce additional-designated materials due by 11/13/2007 by 5:30 p.m. (EST). Motion(s)on administrative record due by 11/30/2007. Cross Motions due by 12/21/2007. Reply due by 1/25/2008. Response due by 1/11/2008. Oral Argument set for 2/4/2008 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 47 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER. This order hereby extended to three new consolidated cases, Nos. 07-760C, 07-761C and 07-766C who now are automatically subject to the terms of that order and are entitled to access to protected information, without further action. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 46 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Additional Portions of Administrative Record in No. 07-732C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 45 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 11/2/2007 10:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (Allegra, Francis)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 44 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Philip Harvey, filed by STG, INC.. (Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 43 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by David Fiske, filed by STG, INC.. (Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 42 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing Additional Portions of Administrative Record in No. 07-732C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 41 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by STG, INC..Response due by 11/19/2007. (Werfel, Gerald)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 40 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record (Designation), filed by CGI FEDERAL INC.,.Response due by 11/19/2007. (Wittie, Patricia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 39 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. (Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 38 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 10/31/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER. Stanley shall file a memorandume by 3:00 p.m. Today, 10/31/2007. Defendant shall file a supplement containing the IBM and EDS proposals due by 11/2/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 37 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing Additional Administrative Record Materials, and Motions for Enlargements of Time in No. 07-732C (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 36 Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.Response due by 11/16/2007. (Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 35 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MODIFIED SCHEDULING ORDER: Administrative Record due by 10/30/2007 5:30 p.m. (EST). Plaintiffs, CGI Federal, Inc. and STG, Inc. shall file their designation of additional documents due by 10/31/2007, 5:30 p.m. (EST). Defendant shall produce additional-designated agency materials due by 11/2/2007 5:30 p.m. (EST). Plaintiffs shall each file a statment of issues raised in their motion for judgment on the administrative record due by 11/7/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MODIFIED PROTECTIVE ORDER: This order hereby extended to two new consolidated cases, Nos. 07-747C and 07-741C who now are automatically subject to the terms of that order and are entitled to access to protected information, without further action. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 33 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record (Designation), filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.Response due by 11/13/2007. (Schor, Susan)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 32 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by USA Of Filing Of Supplement To Administrative Record Under Seal (Todor, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 31 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 10/26/2007 at 11:00 AM via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 30 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REVISED SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file a CD-ROM version of the Administrative Record due by 10/25/07. Plaintiff, Stanley Assoc., Inc., shall file their designation of additional documents due by 10/26/2007. Defendant shall produce the additional-designated agency materials due by 10/30/2007 by 5:30 p.m. (EST). Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record due by 11/13/2007. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors shall file their cross-motions for judgment on the administrative record due by 12/03/2007. Plaintiff shall file its response due by 12/17/2007. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors shall file their replies in support of their cross-motions due by 1/02/2008. Oral Argument set for 1/04/2008 10:00 AM in National Courts Building beforebefore Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 29 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 28 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA. (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 27 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Kevin C. Dwyer, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 26 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by W. Jay DeVecchio, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 24 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 10/19/2007 03:00 PM via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 23 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 22 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM re: [21] Motion to Intervene, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC. (Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 21 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007, Terminated: 10/18/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC.Response due by 11/5/2007.(Churchill, David)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank -- Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [21] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 25 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007 Administrative Record (Supplement)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT to the ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (in CD Format), filed by USA. Filed UNDER SEAL. Service: 10/17/2007.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 20 Filed: 10/17/2007, Entered: 10/17/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE, filed by USA Of Filing Of Supplement To Administrative Record Under Seal (Todor, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 19 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: 10/12/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Supplement the Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          **SEALED** MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record (Designation), filed by SERCO INC..Response due by 10/29/2007. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/10/2007 Administrative Record
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (in CD Fromat), filed by USA. UNDER SEAL. Service: 10/9/2007.(hw1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE, filed by USA Of Filing Of Administrative Record Under Seal (Todor, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/9/2007, Entered: 10/9/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Jacob Todor for USA. (Todor, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Eliane S. Herring, filed by SERCO INC.. (Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/4/2007, Entered: 10/4/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007, Terminated: 10/4/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by SERCO INC..Response due by 10/19/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Petrillo, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: 10/1/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff Proposed Protective Order due by 10/2/07. Defendant and/or Defendant-Intervenors shall file any opposition to Plaintiff's Proposed Protective Order due by 10/3/2007. Defendant shall file a CD-ROM version of the Administrative Record due by 10/9/07. Plaintiff and Defendant-Intervenors shall file their designation of additional documents due by 10/12/2007. Defendant shall produce the additional-designated agency materials due by 10/17/2007 by 5:30 p.m. (EST). Plaintiff shall file its Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record due by 10/29/2007. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors shall file their cross-motions for judgment on the administrative record due by 11/15/2007. Plaintiff shall file its response due by 12/3/2007. Defendant and Defendant-Intervenors shall file their replies in support of their cross-motions due by 12/11/2007. Oral Argument set for 12/14/2007 10:00 AM in National Courts Building before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA. (Chadwick, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Intervene, filed by Indus Corporation.Response due by 10/15/2007.(Welch, William)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [10] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank -- Filed: 9/28/2007, Entered: 9/28/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [8] Motion to Intervene; granting [9] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES.Response due by 10/15/2007.(Humphrey, Thomas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: 9/27/2007, Terminated: 9/28/2007 Motion to Intervene
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS.Response due by 10/15/2007.(McCarthy, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 9/28/2007 02:00 PM via telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007 Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra (mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion to Seal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to File Under Seal, filed by SERCO INC.. Service: 9/26/2007.Response due by 10/15/2007.(mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by SERCO INC.. Service: 9/26/2007.(mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                COMPLAINT against USA (Filing fee $250), filed by SERCO INC..(mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: 9/26/2007
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067154), filed by SERCO INC..Answer due by 11/26/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(mij, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 297 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?