MENKE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00709-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RONALD J. MENKE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by owlservices.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott Harrison York +1 801 363 7726 +1 801 521 4625 syork@owlservices.net
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Douglas K. Mickle +1 202 307 0383 +1 202 353 7988 douglas.mickle@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 10/2/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $702000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 3/10/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (9) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice, filed by all parties.. (Mickle, Douglas)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 7 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
      RESPONSE to [5] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) with accompanying appendix MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) with accompanying appendix Stipulation to Dismiss, filed by RONALD J. MENKE.Reply due by 3/20/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Stipulation to Dismiss)(York, Scott)
        LREF
        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008 Court Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: P's response or Cross Motion to defendant's motion to dismiss due by 2/29/2008. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
          LREF
          Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/10/2008 Motion to Dismiss
          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) with accompanying appendix, filed by USA.Response due by 12/31/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Defendant's Appendix To MTD)(Mickle, Douglas)
            LREF
            Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007
            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas K. Mickle for USA. (Mickle, Douglas)
              LREF
              Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007 Court Filing
              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2)
                LREF
                Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: 10/2/2007
                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067186), filed by RONALD J. MENKE. Answer due by 12/3/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet # (2) Appendix 1# (3) Appendix 2# (4) Appendix 3# (5) Appendix 4# (6) Appendix 5)(mb2)
                  LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 129 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?