STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00732-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Apptis, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Centech Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rotundalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger A Briney +1 202 777 3648 +1 202 777 3649 rogerbriney@rotundalaw.com
No Logo STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MCMANUS, DARDEN & FELSEN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Leslie Schor +1 202 296 9260 +1 202 659 3732 sschor@msadlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eric Chadwick +1 202 616 0476 +1 202 305 7644 kyle.chadwick@usdoj.gov
No Logo Artel Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ARTEL, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by PILIEROMAZZA PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Dearborn, III +1 202 857 1000 +1 202 857 0200 pdearborn@pilieromazza.com
No Logo CGI Federal Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oldaker Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia H. Wittie +1 202 496 3493 +1 202 293 6111 pwittie@obblaw.com
No Logo Serco Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by petrillopowell.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph James Petrillo +1 202 887 4848 +1 202 478 1656 jp@petrillopowell.com
No Logo Stg, Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by POMPAN, MURRAY & WERFEL, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald H. Werfel +1 703 739 1340 ghwerfel@pompanmurray.com
Electronic Data Systems Electronic Data Systems, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Edward McCarthy, Jr. +1 202 624 2500 jmccarthy@crowell.com
General Dynamics Corporation General Dynamics Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "General Dynamics One Source, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Churchill +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dchurchill@jenner.com
No Logo Indus Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Thomas Welch +1 703 226 1868 +1 703 566 6540 WWelch@generalcounsellaw.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant
Officer/Director, Unison Software, Inc.
Officer/Director, Crossworlds Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Humphrey +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 thumphrey@crowell.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/18/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
107-cv-00691-FMA None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, MEMBER
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
APPLICATION for Access to Protected Material by Charles M. Asmar, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. (Schor, Susan)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
    ORDER granting [14] Motion to Intervene; granting [15] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
      LREF
      Legal Document 16 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
      MEMORANDUM re: [15] Motion to Intervene, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC. (Churchill, David)
        LREF
        Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/24/2007 Motion to Intervene
        MOTION to Intervene, filed by General Dynamics One Source, LLC.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Churchill, David)
          LREF
          Legal Document 14 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007, Terminated: 10/24/2007 Motion to Intervene
          Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by Indus Corporation.Response due by 11/8/2007.(Welch, William)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER directing the Clerk to consolidate, for purposes of briefing and decisions, this case with the previously filed matter, Serco Inc. v. United States, No. 07-691C. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
              This case has been consolidated under case number 07-691C pursuant to the order of 10/22/2007. (mb2)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 10/22/2007, Entered: 10/22/2007
                ORDER granting [11] Motion to Intervene; granting [12] Motion to Intervene. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion to Intervene
                  Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by ELECTRONIC DATA SYSTEMS.Response due by 11/5/2007.(McCarthy, John)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007, Terminated: 10/22/2007 Motion to Intervene
                    Unopposed MOTION to Intervene, filed by INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES CORPORATION.Response due by 11/5/2007.(Humphrey, Thomas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/19/2007, Entered: 10/19/2007
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA. (Chadwick, Kyle)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Court Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Francis M. Allegra (vro)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                            MOTION for Protective Order, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. Service: 10/18/2007.Response due by 11/5/2007.(vro)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                              MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. Service: 10/18/2007.Response due by 11/5/2007.(vro)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. Service: 10/18/2007.(vro)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007 Court Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 10/19/2007 03:00 PM via Telephone before Judge Francis M. Allegra. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                    NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [07-691C], filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. Service: 10/18/2007.(vro)
                                      LREF
                                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                      **SEALED**PROPOSED REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,. Redaction of [1] Complaint FILED UNDER SEAL. Service: 10/18/2007.(vro)
                                        LREF
                                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: 10/18/2007
                                        **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067258), filed by STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,.Answer due by 12/17/2007. (Attachments: # (1))(vro) Modified on 10/18/2007 (mb2, ).
                                          LREF

                                          Statistics

                                          This case has been viewed 163 times.

                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                          Space
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                           
                                          PlainSite
                                          Sign Up
                                          Need Password Help?