ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00743-LJB
District Judge Lynn J. Bush, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Technology Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Lee Moorhouse +1 703 749 1311 moorhouser@gtlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Scott D. Slater +1 202 616 0467 scott.slater@usdoj.gov
No Logo PEROT SYSTEMS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC., Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Scott Hommer, III +1 703 760 1600 jshommer@venable.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/24/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 11/6/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 17 Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/6/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion to Dismiss
MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss pursuant to Rule 41(a) Stipulation of Dismissal, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 12/7/2007.(Moorhouse, Richard)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/6/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(ii) this day. (mb2)
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 16 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
      **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by USA.Response due by 11/23/2007. (Slater, Scott)
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 15 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion to Strike
        **SEALED**First MOTION to Strike Improper Lay Opinion Testimony from Declaration of Todd Robyak and to Admit Harm Declaration of Tor Opsahl, filed by PEROT SYSTEMS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC..Response due by 11/23/2007. (Quigley, Patrick)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 14 Filed: 11/5/2007, Entered: 11/5/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
          **SEALED**First MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by PEROT SYSTEMS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC..Response due by 12/6/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Memorandum in Support of Cross-Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record)(Quigley, Patrick)
            LREF
            Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
            **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record Under Rule 52.1, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Response due by 11/19/2007. (Attachments: # (1) # (2))(Moorhouse, Richard)
              LREF
              Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/30/2007 Administrative Record
              **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (mb2)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 10/29/2007, Entered: 10/29/2007
                NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing of Administrative Record (Slater, Scott)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [8] Motion for Protective Order, entering protective order proposed by the parties. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jb2)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007 Court Filing
                    SCHEDULING ORDER:Perot Systems Government Services, Inc.s Motion to Intervene, made orally October 25, 2007 and filed October 26, 2007, is GRANTED;Defendants Unopposed Motion for a Protective Order, filed October 26, 2007, is GRANTED;Defendant shall FILE and serve on the other parties either a CD-ROM of the Administrative Record or an electronic version of same, by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on October 29, 2007; Defendant shall also DELIVER two bound paper copies of the Administrative Record to chambers by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on October 29, 2007;Plaintiff shall FILE a Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on November 1, 2007;Defendant and intervenor-defendant shall FILE Cross Motions for Judgment on the Administrative Record by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on November 5, 2007;Plaintiff shall FILE a Response/Reply to defendants and intervenor-defendants Cross Motions by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on November 7, 2007;Defendant and intervenor-defendant shall FILE Replies by 5:00 p.m., eastern time on November 9, 2007;Telephonic Oral Argument shall be HELD at 2 p.m., eastern time on Tuesday, November 13, 2007.Administrative Record due by 10/29/2007. Plaintiff's Motion due by 11/1/2007. Defendant's and Intervenor-Defendant'sCross Motions due by 11/5/2007. Plaintiff's Response due by 11/7/2007. Defendant's and Intervenor-Defendant's Replies due by 11/9/2007. Oral Argument set for 11/13/2007 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Lynn J. Bush. Signed by Judge Lynn J. Bush. (jb2)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 10/26/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                      MOTION for Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 11/13/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Slater, Scott)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/26/2007, Entered: 10/26/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion to Intervene
                        First MOTION to Intervene, filed by PEROT SYSTEMS GOVERNMENT SERVICES, INC..Response due by 11/13/2007.(Hommer, John)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/25/2007, Entered: 10/25/2007
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Slater for USA. (Slater, Scott)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007 Court Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Lynn J. Bush. (mb2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC. (mb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007, Terminated: 11/6/2007 Motion for Preliminary Injunction
                                  MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.Response due by 11/13/2007.(mb2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/24/2007, Entered: 10/24/2007
                                    COMPLAINT against USA (ED) (Filing fee $250), filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.Answer due by 12/24/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 90 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?