ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00761-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Technology Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Lee Moorhouse +1 703 749 1311 moorhouser@gtlaw.com
No Logo Apptis, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Artel Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ARTEL, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by PILIEROMAZZA PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Dearborn, III +1 202 857 1000 +1 202 857 0200 pdearborn@pilieromazza.com
No Logo Centech Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo CGI Federal Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oldaker Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia H. Wittie +1 202 496 3493 +1 202 293 6111 pwittie@obblaw.com
No Logo Serco Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by petrillopowell.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph James Petrillo +1 202 887 4848 +1 202 478 1656 jp@petrillopowell.com
No Logo STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MCMANUS, DARDEN & FELSEN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Leslie Schor +1 202 296 9260 +1 202 659 3732 sschor@msadlaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eric Chadwick +1 202 616 0476 +1 202 305 7644 kyle.chadwick@usdoj.gov
No Logo NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, Consolidated Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rotundalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger A Briney +1 202 777 3648 +1 202 777 3649 rogerbriney@rotundalaw.com
Office COFC
Filed 10/31/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 3/3/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
107-cv-00691-FMA
Related Cases
107-cv-00732-FMA, 107-cv-00741-FMA, 107-cv-00747-FMA
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
**SEALED**JUDGMENT (lld)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
    This case has been consolidated under case number 07-691 pursuant to the order of 11/2/2007. (mb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER: Pursuant to RCFC 42(a), the Clerk is hereby directed to consolidate this case with the previously filed matter Serco Inc. v. United States, No. 07-691C. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007
        NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA. (Chadwick, Kyle)
          LREF
          Legal Document 8 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
            LREF
            Legal Document 7 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice Of Assignment
            NOTICE of Assignment to Francis M. Allegra (vro)
              LREF
              Legal Document 6 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
              NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [07-732c, 07-691c, 07-741c, 07-747c], filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. Service: 10/31/2007.(vro)
                LREF
                Legal Document 5 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. Service: 10/31/2007.(vro)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Terminated:
                  MOTION for Protective Order, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. Service: 10/31/2007.Response due by 11/19/2007.(vro)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC.. Service: 10/31/2007.Response due by 11/19/2007.(vro)
                      LREF
                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Redacted Document
                      **SEALED**REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC. redacting [1] Complaint. Service: 10/31/2007.(vro)
                        LREF
                        Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 10/31/2007, Entered: 11/1/2007 Complaint
                        **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067311), filed by ADVANCED TECHNOLOGY SYSTEMS, INC..Answer due by 12/31/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(vro)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 165 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?