APPTIS INC., v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00766-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Apptis, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Centech Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rotundalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger A Briney +1 202 777 3648 +1 202 777 3649 rogerbriney@rotundalaw.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"
No Logo Artel Inc., Consolidated Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ARTEL, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by PILIEROMAZZA PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Dearborn, III +1 202 857 1000 +1 202 857 0200 pdearborn@pilieromazza.com
Office COFC
Filed 11/1/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 3/3/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
107-cv-00691-FMA
Related Cases
107-cv-00732-FMA, 107-cv-00741-FMA, 107-cv-00747-FMA
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
**SEALED**JUDGMENT (lld)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
    This case has been consolidated under case number 07-691 pursuant to the order of 11/2/2007. (mb2)
      LREF
      Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/2/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Court Filing
      ORDER: Pursuant to RCFC 42(a), the Clerk is hereby directed to consolidate this case with the previously filed matter Serco Inc. v. United States, No.07-691C. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
        LREF
        Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
          LREF
          Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Notice Of Assignment
          NOTICE of Assignment to Francis M. Allegra (vro)
            LREF
            Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
            Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by APPTIS INC.,. Service: 11/1/2007.(vro)
              LREF
              Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Terminated:
              MOTION for Leave to File Complaint Under Seal, filed by APPTIS INC.,. Service: 11/1/2007.Response due by 11/19/2007.(vro)
                LREF
                Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [07-691,07-732,07-741,07-747], filed by APPTIS INC.,. Service: 11/1/2007.(vro)
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Redacted Document
                  **SEALED**REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by APPTIS INC., redacting [1] Complaint. Service: 11/1/2007.(vro)
                    LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/1/2007, Entered: 11/2/2007 Complaint
                    **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067319), filed by APPTIS INC.,.Answer due by 12/31/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(vro)
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 81 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?