HAVENS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00780-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo WILLIAM HAVENS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bennett Wells +1 985 641 1855 +1 985 649 1536 JohnLawEsq@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 11/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 21 Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: 7/21/2008
RESPONSE to Supplemental Brief, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Edelschick, Douglas)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/15/2008
    ORDER granting [20] Unopposed Motion to Amend/Correct Document 19. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 20 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008, Terminated: 7/15/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
      Unopposed MOTION to Amend/Correct Doc. 19, filed by WILLIAM HAVENS.Response due by 7/31/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Wells, John)
        LREF
        Legal Document 19 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008
        RESPONSE to [18] Order, to file Supplemental Information, filed by WILLIAM HAVENS. (Wells, John)
          LREF
          Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/9/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER FOR SUPPLEMENTAL INFORMATION: Plaintiff shall file a memorandum concerning the inquiries described in the attached order on or before Wednesday, July 16, 2008. Defendant may file a memorandum in response or before Wednesday, July 23, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
            ORDER granting Plaintiff's [16] Motion to Amend/Correct [15] Response to Defendant's [14] Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 17 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
              REPLY to Response to Motion re [14] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. (Edelschick, Douglas)
                LREF
                Legal Document 16 Filed: 6/13/2008, Entered: 6/13/2008, Terminated: 6/24/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
                MOTION to Amend/Correct [15] Response to Motion to Dismisss, filed by WILLIAM HAVENS.Response due by 6/30/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Proposed Pleading)(Wells, John)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 15 Filed: 6/7/2008, Entered: 6/7/2008
                  RESPONSE to [14] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by WILLIAM HAVENS.Reply due by 6/25/2008. (Wells, John) Modified on 6/9/2008 to correct reply deadline (mb2).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 14 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
                    MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
                      ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit AR 1-37, # (2) Exhibit AR 38-84, # (3) Exhibit AR 85-124, # (4) Exhibit AR 125-154, # (5) Exhibit AR 155-184, # (6) Exhibit AR 185-214, # (7) Exhibit AR 215-244, # (8) Exhibit AR 245-266)(Edelschick, Douglas)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
                      NOTICE, filed by USA of Filing Administrative Record (Edelschick, Douglas)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 5/2/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008
                        ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to [9] Amended Complaint. Answer to Amended Complaint due on or before May 26, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008, Terminated: 5/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 26, 2008 to Respond to Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/19/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 4/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                            Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until May 5, 2008 to Respond To Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 4/28/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008
                              ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Amended Complaint. Answer due on or before May 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008
                                AMENDED COMPLAINT First, filed by WILLIAM HAVENS.. (Wells, John)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 2/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until April 21, 2008 to Respond to Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 2/28/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008
                                    ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint. Answer due on or before April 21, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007, Terminated: 12/21/2007 Motion for Extension of Time
                                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until March 7, 2008 to Respond to complaint or amended pleading, filed by USA.Response due by 1/7/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank -- Filed: 12/21/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007
                                        ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time.Answer due by 3/7/2008. Signed by the Clerk. (mb2)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007 Court Filing
                                          SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/7/2007, Entered: 12/7/2007
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Glenn Edelschick for USA. (Edelschick, Douglas)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                              NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Christine O.C. Miller for Auto ADR proceedings. (mb2)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (mb2)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                                    COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067336), filed by WILLIAM HAVENS. Answer due by 1/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                                    LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 150 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?