LUCAS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00779-MCW
District Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ERIC V.M. LUCAS, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by King Horsley & Lyons LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Bennett Wells +1 985 641 1855 +1 985 649 1536 JohnLawEsq@msn.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Samuel Silverbrand +1 202 305 3278 +1 202 353 7988 david.silverbrand@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/7/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 18 Filed: 8/15/2008, Entered: 8/15/2008
ANSWER to [1] Complaint, filed by USA.JPSR due by 10/6/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
    LREF
    Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008 Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant's Supplement to the Administrative Record due by 8/11/2008; Defendant answer due by 8/18/2008; Plaintiff's motion due by 9/30/2008; Defendant's cross-motion and response due 10/30/2008; Plaintiff's response to cross-motions due 11/17/2008; Defendant's reply to Plaintiff's response due 12/5/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 7/30/2008
      Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, D.C. on 7/29/2008 before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams: Scheduling Conference (30 min.). Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(tb1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/26/2008, Entered: 7/26/2008
        MOTION to Supplement the Administrative Record and to Compel the Defendant to Further Supplement the Administrative Record, filed by ERIC V.M. LUCAS.Response due by 8/12/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order, # (2) Supplement)(Wells, John)
          LREF
          Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/18/2008, Entered: 7/18/2008 Court Filing
          STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 7/30/2008 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dph)
            LREF
            Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008
            ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD, filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Index To Administrative Record, # (2) Part 1, # (3) Part 2, # (4) Part 3, # (5) Part 4, # (6) Part 5, # (7) Part 6, # (8) Part 7, # (9) Part 8)(Silverbrand, David)
            LREF
            Legal Document 13 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER denying [9] Motion to Remand Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dph)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
              Minute Entry: A 45-minute telephonic status conference was held before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams on 5/13/2008 at 12:00 p.m. EST. During the status conference the Court heard oral argument on Defendant's motion to remand. The Court orally denied Defendant's motion to remand without prejudice. The Court ordered Defendant to file the administrative record by July 14, 2008. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (dph)
                LREF
                Blank 12 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Court Filing
                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 5/13/2008 at 12:00 p.m. EST in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (dph)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Remand, filed by USA. (Silverbrand, David)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
                    RESPONSE to [9] MOTION to Remand, filed by ERIC V.M. LUCAS.Reply due by 3/17/2008. (Wells, John)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008, Terminated: 5/13/2008 Motion to Remand
                      MOTION to Remand, filed by USA.Response due by 3/3/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/7/2008, Entered: 2/7/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER re: Notice of ADR Automatic Program Procedures. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mkb)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Answer due by 3/7/2008. Signed by Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (tb1)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/31/2007, Entered: 12/31/2007, Terminated: 1/2/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/7/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 1/17/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007
                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Samuel Silverbrand for USA. (Silverbrand, David)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink for Auto ADR proceedings. (mb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007 Court Filing
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Mary Ellen Coster Williams. (mb2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/7/2007, Entered: 11/7/2007
                                      COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067336), filed by ERIC V.M. LUCAS. Answer due by 1/7/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?