AKINSOLA et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00797-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ADEGOKE AKINSOLA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MALKIN LEGAL PRACTICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Anderson Brister +1 318 559 5800 +1 318 559 5680 brister.assistant@gmail.com
No Logo CAROL DENISE MCDANIEL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MALKIN LEGAL PRACTICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Anderson Brister +1 318 559 5800 +1 318 559 5680 brister.assistant@gmail.com
No Logo LINDSEY ABIOLA AKINSOLA, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by MALKIN LEGAL PRACTICES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Anderson Brister +1 318 559 5800 +1 318 559 5680 brister.assistant@gmail.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Lisa Ann Watts +1 202 616 4099 lisa.a.watts@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/13/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Vaccine - Judgment in Lump Sum
County None
Terminated 9/12/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 18 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: 9/12/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 11(a), that petitioners are awarded compensation as follows: (a) A lump sum of $170,000.00, in the form of a check made payable to petitioners as the legal representatives of Lindsey's estate; and (b) A lump sum of $5,000.00, in the form of a check made payable to petitioners and petitioners' attorney, Kenneth Anderson Brister, Esq., for attorneys' fees and costs. (dls)
    LREF
    Blank 17 Filed: 9/3/2008, Entered: 9/10/2008 Notice Not to Seek Review
    Joint NOTICE Not to Seek Review, filed by ADEGOKE AKINSOLA, CAROL DENISE MCDANIEL, LINDSEY ABIOLA AKINSOLA, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES re [16] DECISION of Special Master. (Neal, Alonzo)
      LREF
      Blank 16 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008 DECISION of Special Master
      DECISION Fedex on 8/18/08, tracking number 866510837823 Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank 15 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/16/2008 Stipulation
        JOINT STIPULATION, filed by ADEGOKE AKINSOLA, CAROL DENISE MCDANIEL, LINDSEY ABIOLA AKINSOLA, SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 14 Filed: 7/30/2008, Entered: 8/6/2008 Terminated:
          MOTION to Amend the Case Caption, filed by ADEGOKE AKINSOLA, CAROL DENISE MCDANIEL, LINDSEY ABIOLA AKINSOLA. Service: 7/23/08.Response due by 8/11/2008. (tjk, )
            LREF
            Blank 13 Filed: 7/25/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Status Report
            STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 7/25/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank 12 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 8/1/2008 Order
              ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO CHANGE THE CASE CAPTION Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                LREF
                Blank 11 Filed: 7/15/2008, Entered: 7/22/2008 Notice Regarding Statutory Requirement
                ORDER re: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank 10 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Description not available
                  15-WEEK SETTLEMENT ORDER: Respondent shall, within fifteen (15)weeks, by 7/25/2008, send Petitioner the joint stipulation for Petitioner's signature, and shall advise the court of the same by written status report. Petitioner shall, within thirty (30) days after the receipt of the stipulation, either return the stipulation to Respondent and notiify the court of the same, or file a status of the settlement. Respondent shall file signed stipulation within fifteen (15) days after its receipt from Petitioner. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                    LREF
                    Blank 9 Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/27/2008 Expert Report
                    NOTICE OF FILING: RULE 4(c) REPORT and EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Russo with CV (Ex. A-B) filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/21/08.(tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 8 Filed: 2/26/2008, Entered: 3/2/2008 Affidavit
                      AFFIDAVIT of Petitioner by ADEGOKE AKINSOLA, CAROL DENISE MCDANIEL, LINDSEY ABIOLA AKINSOLA. Service: 2/19/08.(tjk, )
                        LREF
                        Blank 7 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Description not available
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to the status conference held on 2/25/08: Respondent shall file a report, pursuant to Vaccine Rule 4(c), on or before 3/21/08, to include an expert report, expressing Respondent's position on the issue of entitlement. The next Status Conference is set for 4/4/2008 11:30 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                          LREF
                          Blank 6 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/29/2008 Status Conference Order
                          ORDER: Respondent's 4(c) report is held in abeyance, pending Petitioner's upcoming filings; however, Respondent shall update the Court with his then-current position at the next status conference. The next Status Conference is set for 2/25/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (tjk, )
                            LREF
                            Blank 5 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/21/2007 Description not available
                            SCHEDULING ORDER: The ordered Petitioneers to file fact witness affidavits as may be relevant in this case on or before 1/18/2008. Status Conference set for 1/24/2008 11:00 AM before Special Master Richard Abell. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                              LREF
                              Blank 4 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007 Notice of Appearance/
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Ann Watts for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 11/27/07.(Neal, Alonzo)
                                LREF
                                Blank 3 Filed: 11/19/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007 Initial Order
                                INITIAL ORDER The Court will conduct a conference with the parties within the approximately 45 days after the Petition's filing date of 11/13/07. Signed by Special Master Richard Abell. (Neal, Alonzo)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 2 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Richard B. Abell. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 11/13/2007, Entered: 11/14/2007 Petition
                                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067359) [Vaccination date: 1/22/07](Filed in one volume, Exhibits #1-8), filed by ADEGOKE AKINSOLA, CAROL DENISE MCDANIEL, LINDSEY ABIOLA AKINSOLA.Respondents Report due by 2/14/2008.(tjk, )
                                      LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 117 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?