CENTECH GROUP, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00803-FMA
District Judge Francis M. Allegra, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Technology Systems, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Greenberg Traurig, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Lee Moorhouse +1 703 749 1311 moorhouser@gtlaw.com
No Logo Apptis, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dickstein Shapiro LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J. Conway +1 202 420 2235 conwayr@dicksteinshapiro.com
No Logo Artel Inc., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "ARTEL, INCORPORATED"

Toggle Switch Represented by PILIEROMAZZA PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Philip M. Dearborn, III +1 202 857 1000 +1 202 857 0200 pdearborn@pilieromazza.com
No Logo Centech Group, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by THE MARTIN LAW FIRM, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Allen Martin +1 703 918 0350 +1 703 918 0386 Ken@martin-lawfirm.com
No Logo CGI Federal Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Oldaker Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patricia H. Wittie +1 202 496 3493 +1 202 293 6111 pwittie@obblaw.com
No Logo NORTEL GOVERNMENT SOLUTIONS INCORPORATED, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by rotundalaw.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger A Briney +1 202 777 3648 +1 202 777 3649 rogerbriney@rotundalaw.com
No Logo Serco Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by petrillopowell.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph James Petrillo +1 202 887 4848 +1 202 478 1656 jp@petrillopowell.com
No Logo STANLEY ASSOCIATES, INC.,, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by MCMANUS, DARDEN & FELSEN, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Susan Leslie Schor +1 202 296 9260 +1 202 659 3732 sschor@msadlaw.com
No Logo Stg, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by POMPAN, MURRAY & WERFEL, PLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerald H. Werfel +1 703 739 1340 ghwerfel@pompanmurray.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kyle Eric Chadwick +1 202 616 0476 +1 202 305 7644 kyle.chadwick@usdoj.gov
Electronic Data Systems Electronic Data Systems, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Edward McCarthy, Jr. +1 202 624 2500 jmccarthy@crowell.com
General Dynamics Corporation General Dynamics Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "GENERAL DYNAMICS ONE SOURCE, LLC"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Churchill +1 202 639 6000 +1 202 639 6066 dchurchill@jenner.com
No Logo INDUS CORPORATION, Intervenor-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by General Counsel, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Thomas Welch +1 703 226 1868 +1 703 566 6540 WWelch@generalcounsellaw.com
International Business Machines Corporation International Business Machines Corporation, Intervenor-Defendant
Officially listed as "INTERNATIONAL BUSINESS MACHINES"
Officer/Director, Unison Software, Inc.
Officer/Director, Crossworlds Software, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Crowell & Moring LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas P. Humphrey +1 202 624 2500 +1 202 628 5116 thumphrey@crowell.com
Office COFC
Filed 11/15/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Preliminary Injunction
County None
Terminated 3/3/2008
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
107-cv-00691-FMA None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF, MEMBER
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008
**SEALED**JUDGMENT (lld)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/9/2008, Entered: 1/9/2008
    ORDER striking [12] Motion for Leave to File. Further filings shall be filed under the lead case, Serco, Inc., Doc. No. 07-691C. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
      LREF
      Sealed Legal Document 12 Filed: 1/8/2008, Entered: 1/8/2008, Terminated: 1/9/2008 Motion for Leave to File
      **SEALED** MOTION for Leave to File Redacted Complaint, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC..Response due by 1/25/2008. (Attachments: # (1))(Martin, Kenneth)
        LREF
        Sealed Legal Document 11 Filed: 11/30/2007, Entered: 11/30/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record
        **SEALED** Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC..Response due by 12/17/2007. (Martin, Kenneth)
          LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 10 Filed: 11/26/2007, Entered: 11/26/2007
          **SEALED**NOTICE, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC. Statement of Issues (Martin, Kenneth)
            LREF
            Legal Document 9 Filed: 11/16/2007, Entered: 11/16/2007
            NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle Eric Chadwick for USA For Access To Unredacted Complaint. (Chadwick, Kyle)
              LREF
              Legal Document 8 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
                LREF
                Legal Document 7 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                NOTICE of Assignment to FRANCIS M. ALLEGRA (vro)
                  LREF
                  Sealed Legal Document 6 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                  **SEALED**REDACTED DOCUMENT, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC. redacting [2] Complaint. Service: 11/15/2007.(vro)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                    Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC.. Service: 11/15/2007.(vro)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007, Terminated: 3/3/2008 Motion for Leave to File
                      MOTION for Leave to File CASE UNDER SEAL, filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC.. Service: 11/15/2007.Response due by 12/3/2007.(vro)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Court Filing
                        ORDER: Any objection to or comment on proposed case management plan due by 5:30 pm on 11/16/2007.Notice of Compliance due by 11/16/2007. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                          LREF
                          Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007
                          **SEALED**COMPLAINT against USA (GSA) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067368), filed by CENTECH GROUP, INC..Answer due by 1/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(vro)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 11/15/2007 Court Filing
                            ORDER. Pursuant to RCFC 42(a), the Clerk is hereby directed to consolidate this case with the previously filed matter Serco Inc. v. United States, No. 07-691C. Signed by Judge Francis M. Allegra. (si1, )
                              LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 11/15/2007, Entered: 2/4/2008 Set Member Flag
                              This case has been consolidated under case number 07-691C pursuant to the order of November 15, 2007. (dls)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 277 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?