LEVY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00829-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MATHEW LEVY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gilbert Jerome Ginsburg +1 202 776 7772 gilgins@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Roger Allen Hipp +1 202 305 3091 +1 202 514 8640 roger.hipp@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/27/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $242000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated 8/11/2008
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 26 Filed: 8/11/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, dismissing the complaint with prejudice. Costs to defendant. (dls)
    LREF
    Legal Document 25 Filed: 8/8/2008, Entered: 8/8/2008 Court Filing
    This Opinion will be published. The Clerk is directed to enter Judgment in favor of Defendant, granting [21] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss - Rule 12(b)(1), and to Dismiss the case. Costs awarded to Defendant. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc) (lld).
      LREF
      Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/18/2008, Entered: 6/18/2008
      SUR-REPLY re [21] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) to Defendant's Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss, filed by MATHEW LEVY. (Ginsburg, Gilbert)
        LREF
        Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [21] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA. (Hipp, Roger)
          LREF
          Legal Document 22 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: 6/2/2008
          RESPONSE to [21] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by MATHEW LEVY. Reply due by 6/12/2008 (per court order). (Ginsburg, Gilbert) Modified on 6/2/2008 to edit response due date. (dls).
            LREF
            Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/22/2008, Terminated: 8/8/2008 Motion to Dismiss
            MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 6/5/2008 (per court order).(Hipp, Roger) Modified on 5/26/2008 to edit response due date. (dls).
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 5/22/2008, Entered: 5/26/2008 Set Motion Deadlines/Hearings
              Set Deadlines as to [21] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1). Response due by 6/5/2008. Reply due by 6/12/2008. (dls)
                LREF
                Legal Document 20 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008
                Third AMENDED COMPLAINT , filed by MATHEW LEVY. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-14, # (2) Exhibits 15-16, # (3) Exhibits 17-19)(Ginsburg, Gilbert)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 19 Filed: 5/9/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a corrected Third Amended Complaint by 5/13/2008, 12:00 PM. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 18 Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008 Amended Complaint
                    SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibits 1-19)(Ginsburg, Gilbert)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [16] Motion for Extension of Time to file Second Amended Complaint. Amended briefing schedule for Defendant's Revised Motion to Dismiss also established. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 16 Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/1/2008, Terminated: 5/1/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                        First MOTION for Extension of Time until May 8, 2008 file 2nd amended complaint , filed by MATHEW LEVY. Response due by 5/19/2008.(Ginsburg, Gilbert) Modified on 5/2/2008 to edit docket text to indicate what extension is for.(Samler, Debbie).
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/1/2008, Entered: 5/2/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Plaintiff's second amended complaint due by 5/8/2008; defendant's revised motion to dismiss due by 5/22/2008; plaintiff's response due by 6/5/08; and defendant's reply due by 6/12/2008. (dls)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [13] MOTION for More Definite Statement 1:07-cv-829, filed by MATHEW LEVY. (Ginsburg, Gilbert)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
                              ORDER: Plaintiff files second amended complaint by 4/23/2008. Defendant files revised motion to dismiss by 5/9/2008. Plaintiff files response by 5/30/2008. Defendant files reply by 6/6/2008. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/4/2008, Entered: 4/4/2008, Terminated: 4/14/2008 Motion for More Definite Statement
                                MOTION for More Definite Statement, filed by USA.Response due by 4/21/2008.(Hipp, Roger)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                                  CORRECTED AMENDED COMPLAINT 1:07-cv-829, filed by MATHEW LEVY.. (Ginsburg, Gilbert) Modified on 3/13/2008 to edit docket text.(Samler, Debbie).
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Court Filing
                                    ORDER: Corrected First Amended Complaint due by 3/17/2008. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
                                      Order regarding request to modify the scheduling order. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(vh1)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008, Terminated: 2/25/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                                        Joint MOTION to Amend Schedule re: [7] Order,, filed by USA.Response due by 3/10/2008.(Hipp, Roger)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008
                                          AMENDED COMPLAINT re [1] Complaint, 1:07-cv-829, filed by MATHEW LEVY.. (Ginsburg, Gilbert)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/4/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Court Filing
                                            ORDER Plaintiff First Amended Complaint filed by 3/4/2008. Defendant Revised Motion to Dismiss filed by 4/4/2008. Plaintiff response brief filed by 5/5/2008. Defendant reply brief filed by 5/23/2008. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (rpc)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/28/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008, Terminated: 8/11/2008 Motion to Dismiss
                                              MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1), filed by USA.Response due by 2/28/2008.(Hipp, Roger)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008 Court Filing
                                                STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:Status Conference set for 2/4/2008 10:30 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(vh1)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008
                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Roger Allen Hipp for USA. (Hipp, Roger)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dw1)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Complaint
                                                        COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067412) filed by MATHEW LEVY. Answer due by 1/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit # (3) Exhibit # (4) Exhibit # (5) Exhibit # (6) Exhibit # (7) Exhibit # (8) Exhibit # (9) Exhibit # (10) Exhibit # (11) Exhibit # (12) Exhibit # (13) Exhibit # (14) Exhibit)(dw1)
                                                        LREF

                                                        Statistics

                                                        This case has been viewed 148 times.

                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                        Space
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                         
                                                        PlainSite
                                                        Sign Up
                                                        Need Password Help?