LIBERTY FRUIT COMPANY, INC. v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00830-RHH
District Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Liberty Fruit Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Cyrus E Phillips

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Cyrus E. Phillips, IV +1 202 466 7008 +1 202 466 7009 lawyer@procurement-lawyer.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 11/28/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $8298000
Nature of Suit 140 - Contract - Injunction (Post Award)
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed - Voluntarily
County None
Terminated 12/18/2007
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags CLOSED, ECF
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 11 Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 12/18/2007
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice, filed by LIBERTY FRUIT COMPANY, INC. (Phillips, Cyrus)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 12/18/2007, Entered: 1/15/2008 Terminated Case - Public
    Complaint dismissed pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(i) this day. (dls)
      LREF
      Legal Document 12 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/19/2007 Administrative Record
      **SEALED**ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD filed by USA, by leave of the judge. Service: 12/6/2007.(jyh) Additional attachment(s) added on 12/19/2007 (Hitch, Jessica).
        LREF
        Legal Document 10 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007, Terminated: 12/18/2007 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        Unopposed MOTION Leave To File Administrative Record By CD-ROM, filed by USA.(Prouty, Jonathan)
          LREF
          Legal Document 9 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007
          DECLARATION re [8] Order on Motion for Protective Order Protective Order Application by LIBERTY FRUIT COMPANY, INC.. (Phillips, Cyrus)
            LREF
            Legal Document 8 Filed: 12/6/2007, Entered: 12/6/2007 Court Filing
            ORDER granting [5] Motion for Protective Order Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges Jr. (mc3)
              LREF
              Legal Document 7 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
              JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by USA. (Prouty, Jonathan)
                LREF
                Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: 12/4/2007
                NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Reid Prouty for USA. (Prouty, Jonathan)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/3/2007, Entered: 12/3/2007, Terminated: 12/6/2007 Motion for Protective Order
                  Unopposed MOTION for Protective Order, filed by USA.Response due by 12/20/2007. (Attachments: # (1) Text of Proposed Order)(Prouty, Jonathan)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                    NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (dw1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 3 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007 Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr.. (dw1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                        Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement filed by LIBERTY FRUIT COMPANY, INC.. Service: 11/28/07.(dw1)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/28/2007, Entered: 11/28/2007
                          COMPLAINT against USA (DOD) (Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067413) filed by LIBERTY FRUIT COMPANY, INC.. Answer due by 1/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(dw1) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/28/2007 (Williams, Derek).
                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                          Space Space

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 57 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?