HYDE v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00828-NBF
District Judge Nancy B. Firestone, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo LOURDES HYDE, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by PASSMAN & KAPLAN, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sandra Mazliah +1 202 789 0100 SMazliah@passmanandkaplan.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space David Samuel Silverbrand +1 202 305 3278 +1 202 353 7988 david.silverbrand@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 11/27/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 354 - Military Pay - SBP
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 28 Filed: 7/14/2008, Entered: 7/14/2008 Court Filing
ORDER granting [27] Motion to Stay Status Report due by 11/14/2008 Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jo)
    LREF
    Legal Document 27 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 7/14/2008 Motion to Stay
    Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings For 120 Days, filed by USA.Response due by 7/28/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
      LREF
      Legal Document 26 Filed: 7/8/2008, Entered: 7/8/2008 Court Filing
      ORDER granting [25] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 7/17/2008; Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Admin. Record due by 8/18/2008; Defendant's Response due by 9/16/2008; and Plaintiff's Reply due by 10/2/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
        LREF
        Legal Document 25 Filed: 7/3/2008, Entered: 7/3/2008, Terminated: 7/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
        MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/17/2008 to file the administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 7/21/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
          LREF
          Legal Document 24 Filed: 6/17/2008, Entered: 6/17/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER granting [23] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 7/3/2008; Plaintiff's motion for judgment on record due by 8/4/2008; Defendant's Response due by 9/2/2008; and Plaintiff's Reply due by 9/18/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
            LREF
            Legal Document 23 Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008, Terminated: 6/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 07/03/08 to file the administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 6/30/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
              LREF
              Legal Document 22 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 5/29/2008 Court Filing
              ORDER granting [21]Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 6/12/2008; Plaintiff's motion for judgment on the administrative record due by 7/14/2008; Defendant's response due by 8/11/2008; and Plaintiff's reply due by 8/28/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                LREF
                Legal Document 21 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008, Terminated: 5/29/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 06/12/08 to filing the administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 20 Filed: 4/30/2008, Entered: 4/30/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [19] Motion for Extension of Time. Administrative Record due by 5/30/2008; Plaintiff's motion for Judgment on Administrative Record due by 6/30/2008; Defendant's Response due by 7/28/2008; and Plaintiff's Reply due by 8/11/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 19 Filed: 4/29/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 4/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 05/30/2008 to file the administrative record, filed by USA.Response due by 5/16/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 18 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Court Filing
                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Defendant shall file the Administrative Record by 4/30/2008; Plaintiff's Motion for Judgment on the Administrative Record due by 5/30/2008; Defendant's Response Brief due by 6/27/2008; and Plaintiff's Reply due by 7/11/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 17 Filed: 4/10/2008, Entered: 4/10/2008
                        JOINT STATUS REPORT, filed by all parties. (Silverbrand, David)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 16 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008 Court Filing
                          ORDER denying [9] Motion to Remand. Joint Status Report due 4/11/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jo)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 15 Filed: 3/24/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008
                            REPLY to Response to Motion re [9] MOTION to Remand to the Department of the Navy, filed by USA. (Silverbrand, David)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 14 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
                              RESPONSE to [9] MOTION to Remand to the Department of the Navy, filed by LOURDES HYDE.Reply due by 3/24/2008. (Mazliah, Sandra)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 13 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [12] Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's response to defendant's motion to remand due by 3/10/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 12 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/5/2008, Terminated: 3/6/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                  First MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2008 to respond to motion for remand, filed by LOURDES HYDE.Response due by 3/24/2008.(Mazliah, Sandra)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 11 Filed: 2/21/2008, Entered: 2/21/2008 Court Filing
                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff's Response to Government's Motion to Remand due by 3/6/2008. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (jo)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Court Filing
                                      STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Status Conference set for 2/21/2008 11:00 AM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Nancy B. Firestone. Signed by Judge Nancy B. Firestone. (dpk)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 3/28/2008 Motion to Remand
                                        MOTION to Remand to the Department of the Navy, filed by USA.Response due by 2/28/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
                                          CLERK'S NOTICE granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Pursuant RCFC 77.2(a). Signed by Acting Clerk of Court. Answer due by 2/11/2008. (hw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/25/2008, Terminated: 1/30/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                                            Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until 2/11/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 2/11/2008.(Silverbrand, David)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 6 Filed: 12/11/2007, Entered: 12/11/2007
                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David Samuel Silverbrand for USA. (Silverbrand, David)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 5 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                                NOTICE of Assignment to Judge CHRISTINE O.C. MILLER for Auto ADR proceedings. (vro)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Legal Document 4 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                                  NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (vro)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Legal Document 2 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                                    NOTICE of Assignment to Judge NANCY B. FIRESTONE (vro)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Legal Document 1 Filed: 11/27/2007, Entered: 11/29/2007 Complaint
                                                      COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) (Filing fee $250), filed by LOURDES HYDE.Answer due by 1/28/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(vro)
                                                      LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 166 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?