DAY v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00868-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo JEANNETTE DAY, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by J M Computer Services, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Curtis R. Webb +1 208 734 1616 crwebb@mindspring.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Patrick Milmoe +1 202 616 4125 mike.milmoe@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/10/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (12) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 8/25/2008, Entered: 8/31/2008 Status Conference Order
ORDER: A telephonic status conference was held on 8/22/08. Petitioner is continuing to gather records in this case and shall file upon locating them. Petitioner shall also pursue retaining an expert to support petitioner's allegations. Petitioner also indicated a willingness to engage in possible litigative risk settlement and willl prepare a demand for respondent, if appropriate. The next Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/23/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 8/22/2008, Entered: 8/22/2008
    Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 8/22/2008 held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: Status Conference held on 8/22/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 6/30/2008, Entered: 7/9/2008 Description not available
      SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 8/22/2008 02:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
        LREF
        Blank -- Filed: 6/27/2008, Entered: 6/27/2008
        Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 6/27/2008 held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: Status Conference held on 6/27/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
          LREF
          Blank 6 Filed: 5/6/2008, Entered: 5/9/2008 Description not available
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner Expert Report due by 6/20/2008. Status Conference set for 6/27/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 5/5/2008, Entered: 5/5/2008
            Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 5/5/2008 held before Special Master Special Master Laura D. Millman: Status Conference held on 5/5/2008. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. Petitioner is continuing to gather records in this case and shall file them upon locating them. Petitioner shall also file an expert report and accompanying CV by Friday, June 20, 2008.The next telephonic status conference shall be held on Friday, June 27, 2008, at 2:00 p.m. (EDT). (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(ml)
              LREF
              Blank 5 Filed: 1/25/2008, Entered: 1/28/2008 Description not available
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file an Expert Report and CV due by 4/25/08. The deadline for the filing of respondent's Rule 4(c) Report is hereby SUSPENDED pending petitioner's filing of an expert report. The next Telephonic Status Conference is set for 5/5/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 1/24/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008
                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Laura D. Millman: An initial status conference was held on January 24, 2008. Petitioner shall file an expert report by April 25, 2008. The deadline for respondent's Rule 4(c) Report is suspended pending the filing of petitioner's expert report.
                  LREF
                  Blank 4 Filed: 1/11/2008, Entered: 1/14/2008 Status Conference Order
                  ORDER: The Initial Status Conference is set for 1/24/2008 02:00 PM before Special Master Laura D. Millman. Signed by Special Master Laura D. Millman. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 3 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/7/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Patrick Milmoe for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/3/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                      LREF
                      Blank 2 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Laura Millman. (Neal, Alonzo)
                        LREF
                        Blank 1 Filed: 12/10/2007, Entered: 12/12/2007 Petition
                        PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067452) [Vaccination date: 10/14/04], filed by JEANNETTE DAY.Respondents Report due by 3/13/2008.(Neal, Alonzo)
                          LREF

                          Statistics

                          This case has been viewed 160 times.

                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                          Space
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                           
                          PlainSite
                          Sign Up
                          Need Password Help?