YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00876-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Watt Tieder Hoffar & Fitzgerald, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Edward Heffernan +1 703 749 1000 +1 703 749 0699 theffern@wthf.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/14/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $77000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, STAYED
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
RESPONSE to [14] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases Plaintiff Yankee Atomic's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 9/29/2008. (Heffernan, Timothy)
    LREF
    Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2008 to respond to Defendant United States' Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Response due by 9/22/2008.(Heffernan, Timothy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
      MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER granting in part and denying in part [11] Motion to Stay. Proceedings in this matter shall be stayed until thirty days after the final decision by the Federal Circuit in the pending Yankee I appeal. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
          Case Stayed (lae)
            LREF
            Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
            RESPONSE to [11] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings In This Matter, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY.Reply due by 4/28/2008. (Heffernan, Timothy)
              LREF
              Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion to Stay
              MOTION to Stay All Proceedings In This Matter, filed by USA.Response due by 4/14/2008.(Gardner, Joshua)
                LREF
                Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/28/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 3/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/28/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 3/31/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. Answer due by 3/13/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/13/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 3/3/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge James F. Merow. (mb2)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                              NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [98-126C], filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (mb2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. (mb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Complaint
                                  COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067477), filed by YANKEE ATOMIC ELECTRIC COMPANY. Answer due by 2/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 210 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?