MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00877-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maine Yankee Atomic Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Watt Tieder Hoffar & Fitzgerald, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Timothy Edward Heffernan +1 703 749 1000 +1 703 749 0699 theffern@wthf.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr. +1 202 616 0478 +1 202 307 2503 harv.lester@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/14/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $32000000
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags ECF, STAYED
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 96 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re 94 SEALED Order on Motion to Compel REISSUED UNSEALED THIS DATE. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Copy to parties.
    LREF
    Legal Document 16 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
    RESPONSE to [14] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases Plaintiff Maine Yankee's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 9/29/2008. (Heffernan, Timothy)
      LREF
      Legal Document 15 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008
      Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until September 15, 2008 to respond to Defendant United States' Motion to Coordinate Discovery and Develop a Litigation Plan for the Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Response due by 9/22/2008.(Heffernan, Timothy)
        LREF
        Legal Document 14 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
        MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER granting in part and denying in part [11] Motion to Stay. Proceedings in this matter shall be stayed until thirty days after the final decision by the Federal Circuit in the pending Yankee I appeal. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 6/16/2008, Entered: 6/16/2008
            Case Stayed (lae)
              LREF
              Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
              RESPONSE to [11] MOTION to Stay All Proceedings In This Matter, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY.Reply due by 4/28/2008. (Heffernan, Timothy)
                LREF
                Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/28/2008, Entered: 3/28/2008, Terminated: 6/16/2008 Motion to Stay
                MOTION to Stay All Proceedings In This Matter, filed by USA.Response due by 4/14/2008.(Gardner, Joshua)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 10 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/28/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008, Terminated: 3/17/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/28/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 3/31/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 8 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint. Answer due by 3/13/2008. Signed by Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                        Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/13/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 3/3/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge James F. Merow. (mb2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Notice of Directly Related Case(s)
                                NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [98-474C], filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (mb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                  Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. (mb2)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/14/2007, Entered: 12/17/2007 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067476), filed by MAINE YANKEE ATOMIC POWER COMPANY. Answer due by 2/14/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                    LREF

                                    Statistics

                                    This case has been viewed 217 times.

                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                    Space
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                     
                                    PlainSite
                                    Sign Up
                                    Need Password Help?