CELLCO PARTNERSHIP v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-cv-00888-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cellco Partnership, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by White & Case LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael Quigley +1 202 626 3593 +1 202 639 9355 michaelquigley@whitecase.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jennifer Dover Spriggs +1 202 307 0840 +1 202 514 9440 jennifer.d.spriggs@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/19/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand $2120000
Nature of Suit 206 - Tax - Excise
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008
Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 8/4/2008 before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich: Telephonic Status Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Official Record of proceeding taken via electronic digital recording (EDR). (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(EJ1)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008 Court Filing
    SCHEDULING ORDER: Fact discovery in this case will commence immediately and close on Monday, December 1, 2008. The parties shall file a joint status report outlining their plans to file dispositive motions, pursue settlement, or proceed to trial on or before Friday, December 5, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
      LREF
      Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/2/2008, Entered: 7/2/2008 Court Filing
      JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER: Joint Preliminary Status Conference set for Monday, August 4, 2008 in Chambers (Telephonic) before Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 17 Filed: 5/28/2008, Entered: 5/28/2008
        JOINT PRELIMINARY STATUS REPORT. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix, # (2) Exhibit)(Spriggs, Jennifer)
          LREF
          Legal Document 16 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
          ORDER Corrected Order.Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(vh1)
            LREF
            Legal Document 15 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008 Court Filing
            ORDER Deferring ADR at this time. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(vh1)
              LREF
              Legal Document 14 Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008
              ANSWER to [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.JPSR due by 6/2/2008.(Spriggs, Jennifer)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008
                ORDER granting [13] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1) Modified on 4/9/2008 to remove the document number (mb2, ).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 4/9/2008, Entered: 4/9/2008
                  Minute Entry for proceeding held in Washington, DC on 4/9/2008 before Judge Marian Blank Horn: ADR Conference. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (Click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(rpc)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 4/8/2008, Entered: 4/8/2008, Terminated: 4/9/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                    MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/9/2000 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 4/25/2008.(Spriggs, Jennifer)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 12 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Court Filing
                      ADR SCHEDULING ORDER:ADR Conference set for 4/9/2008 02:30PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by ADR Judge Marian Blank Horn. ADR Confidentiality Agreements due by 4/7/2008. (rpc)
                        LREF
                        Blank -- Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: 3/13/2008
                        ORDER granting [11] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due on or before April 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1) Modified on 3/13/2008 to remove document number (mb2, ).
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 11 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/11/2008, Terminated: 3/13/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 4/8/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 3/28/2008.(Spriggs, Jennifer)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 10 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 2/29/2008 Court Filing
                            ORDER ADR telephone status conference rescheduled to 3/26/2008, 2:30 pm EST. ADR Confidentiality Agreement due 3/19/2008. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(vh1)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 9 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008, Terminated: 2/11/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until 3/25/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 2/28/2008.(Spriggs, Jennifer)
                                LREF
                                Blank -- Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/11/2008
                                ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 3/25/2008. Signed by the Clerk. (mb2)
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 1/18/2008, Entered: 1/18/2008 Court Filing
                                  STATUS CONFERENCE ORDER:ADR Status Conference set for 3/7/2008, 2:30 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Judge Marian Blank Horn. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn.(vh1)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Court Filing
                                    SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 1/2/2008, Entered: 1/2/2008
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Dover Spriggs for USA. (Spriggs, Jennifer)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Marian Blank Horn for Auto ADR proceedings. (mb2)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (mb2)
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Disclosure Statement - Rule 7.1
                                              Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP. (mb2)
                                                LREF
                                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 12/19/2007, Entered: 12/20/2007 Complaint
                                                COMPLAINT against USA (TRE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067495), filed by CELLCO PARTNERSHIP. Answer due by 2/19/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit # (2) Exhibit 1# (3) Civil Cover Sheet)(mb2)
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 192 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?