LE v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:07-vv-00895-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo TIEU BINH LE, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian Robert Arnold +1 214 739 4216 +1 972 243 2666 arnoldenda@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Francis Topping, Jr. +1 202 305 1586 +1 202 305 4130 richard.topping@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 12/26/2007
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 9 Filed: 5/29/2008, Entered: 6/6/2008 notice of filing
NOTICE OF FILING Supplemental Report of Charles Tuen, MD. (Tab 11); and New Table of Contents by TIEU BINH LE. Service: 5/16/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank 8 Filed: 3/27/2008, Entered: 3/30/2008 Status Report/Order
    STATUS REPORT ORDER. Petitioner is ORDERED to file a Status Report regarding the gathering of medical records requested by respondent due by 3/27/2008. After the filing of the medical records, another status conference will be held, to discuss the time period of residual effects of the vaccination. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008 Status Report
      STATUS REPORT, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/17/08.(tjk, )
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: 2/13/2008 Medical Records
        MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #8, Charles Tuen, M.D., Ex 9, Jay Meng, M.D., Ex 10, Stella L. Kwong, M.D. filed by TIEU BINH LE. Service: 2/6/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 2/5/2008, Entered: 2/6/2008 Description not available
          SCHEDULING ORDER: All outstanding Medical records due by 3/3/2008. Status Report due by 3/17/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 1/30/2008, Entered: 1/30/2008
            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Initial Status Conference held on 1/30/08. (szs)
              LREF
              Blank 4 Filed: 1/17/2008, Entered: 1/21/2008 Initial Order
              INITIAL ORDER. The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk by 1/28/08 to schedule the initial status conference call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                LREF
                Blank 3 Filed: 1/15/2008, Entered: 1/17/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Francis Topping, Jr for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 1/15/08.(Neal, Alonzo)
                  LREF
                  Blank 2 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Notice Of Assignment
                  NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 1 Filed: 12/26/2007, Entered: 12/28/2007 Petition
                    PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067513) [Vaccination date: 12/30/04](Filed with one volume, Exhibits #1-7), filed by TIEU BINH LE.Respondents Report due by 3/28/2008.(tjk, )
                      LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 131 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?