HEINLEN et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:98-cv-09435-MBH
District Judge Marian Blank Horn, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DONALD E. RECKART, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo LARRY M. OATES, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo MICHAEL J. LITTLEFIELD, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
No Logo ROBERT D. HEINLEN, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kutak Rock, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Barry P. Steinberg +1 202 828 2400 barry.steinberg@kutakrock
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 1/3/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition Dismissed
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag CLOSED
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 6 Filed: 5/15/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008
JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that the claims of Robert D. Heinlen, Michael J. Littlefield, Larry M. Oates and donald E. Reckart, are dismissed, with prejudice. Each party shall bear his own costs, attorney fees and expenses pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. (lld)
    LREF
    Blank 5 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Stipulation for Entry of JudgmentCourt Filing
    STIPULATION of Entry of Judgment, filed by all parties. By leave of Judge. (lld)
      LREF
      Blank 4 Filed: 5/12/2008, Entered: 5/15/2008 Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment - Rule 60Court Filing
      ORDER granting [3] Motion for Relief from Judgment ; granting [3] Motion for Leave to File Amended Stipulation for Entry of Judgment. The judgment of January 4, 2008 is vacated. The court directs the clerk to dismiss with prejudice, pursuant to Rule 54(b), the claims of Robert D. Heinlein, Michael J. Littlefield, Larry M. Oates and Donald E. Reckart, with each party to bear his own costs, attorney fees and expenses pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (lld)
        LREF
        Blank 3 Filed: 4/23/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008, Terminated: 5/12/2008 Terminated:
        JOINT MOTION for Relief from Judgment pursuant to Rule 60 re [2] Judgment, and MOTION for leave to file an amended stipulation for entry of judgment, filed by USA, ROBERT D. HEINLEN, MICHAEL J. LITTLEFIELD, LARRY M. OATES, DONALD E. RECKART. Service: 4/24/08.(dls)
          LREF
          Blank 2 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008
          JUDGMENT entered, pursuant to Rule 58, that plaintiffs' claims are dismissed, with prejudice, with each party to bear his own costs, attorney fees and expenses pursuant to the Settlement Agreement. (dls) Vacated by Order filed 5/12/2008(lld).
            LREF
            Blank 1 Filed: 1/3/2008, Entered: 1/4/2008 Order Dismissing CaseCourt Filing
            ORDER severing plaintiffs from No. 98-943C, and directing the Clerk to dismiss plaintiffs' claims with prejudice, with each party to bear his own costs, attorney fees and expenses. Signed by Judge Marian Blank Horn. (dls)
              LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 113 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?