WILLIAMS v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00047-EGB
District Judge Eric G. Bruggink, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS, Plaintiff
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Lonnie Krafchek +1 202 305 0041 +1 202 514 8624 Christopher.Krafchek@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $10000
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 15 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
NOTICE of Addendum, filed by HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS. Filed by leave of the Judge. (jt1)
    LREF
    Blank 14 Filed: 9/10/2008, Entered: 9/11/2008 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER directing the clerk's office to file plaintiff's addendum and to serve a copy on defendant's counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jt1)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/9/2008 Order on Motion to ContinueCourt Filing
      ORDER granting [12] Motion to Continue stay of proceedings. Defendant's status report due by 12/29/08, or at an earlier date if the ABCMR issues its opinion prior to said date. Signed by Judge Robert H. Hodges, Jr., for Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jt1)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008, Terminated: 9/8/2008 Terminated:
        MOTION to Continue Stay, filed by HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS. Service: 8/20/08.Response due by 9/19/2008.(jt1)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 8/29/2008, Entered: 9/4/2008 Status Report
          STATUS REPORT and request to stay proceedings, filed by USA. Service: 8/29/08.(jt1)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 ~Notice (other)Court Filing
            NOTICE of Correspondence addressed to the Department of the Army (Ms. Catherine C. Mitrano) from Sgt. Herman Edward Williams, filed by HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS. Filed by leave of the Judge.` Service: 7/28/08.(jt1)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 8/19/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008 OrderCourt Filing
              ORDER directing the Clerk to file Plaintiff's submission dated July 26, 2008 and serve a copy on defendant's counsel. Signed by Senior Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (jt1)
                LREF
                Blank 8 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [6] Motion ; granting [7] Motion to Stay. Status Report due by 8/29/2008. Signed by Judge John P. Wiese. (mb2)
                  LREF
                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Terminated:
                  MOTION to Stay the Proceedings, filed by USA. Service: 3/5/2008. Response due by 3/24/2008.(mb2)
                    LREF
                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/4/2008, Terminated: 3/12/2008 Terminated:
                    MOTION for Stay of Execution, filed by HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS. Service: 3/1/2008. Response due by 3/20/2008.(mb2)
                      LREF
                      Blank 5 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/14/2008 Court Filing
                      ORDER granting [2] Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2)
                        LREF
                        Blank 4 Filed: 1/31/2008, Entered: 2/4/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lonnie Krafchek for USA. Service: 1/31/2008.(mb2)
                          LREF
                          Blank 3 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Eric G. Bruggink. (mb2)
                            LREF
                            Blank 2 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008, Terminated: 2/14/2008 Terminated:
                            MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS. Response due by 2/8/2008.(mb2)
                              LREF
                              Blank 1 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/23/2008 Complaint
                              COMPLAINT against USA (ARM), filed by HERMAN EDWARD WILLIAMS. Answer due by 3/24/2008.(mb2)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 219 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?