BLANKENSHIP v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00048-EJD
District Judge Edward J. Damich, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MALCOLM B. BLANKENSHIP, III, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by williamcassara.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space William Emil Cassara +1 706 860 5769 bill@williamcassara.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Christopher Lonnie Krafchek +1 202 305 0041 +1 202 514 8624 Christopher.Krafchek@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 1/22/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand $100000
Nature of Suit 346 - Military Pay - Correct/Reinstate
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status ADRstart
Flags ADR, AUTO, ECF
  Entries (17) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 14 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
REPLY to Response to Motion re [11] MOTION to Dismiss, and, in the alternative, Motion for Judgment Upon the Administrative Record filed by USA. (Krafchek, Christopher) Modified on 7/25/2008 (Taylor, Joseph).
    LREF
    Legal Document 13 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
    RESPONSE to [12] MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2008 to, [11] MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Or, In The Alternative For Judgment Upon the Administartive Record MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Or, In The Alternative For Judgment Upon the Administartive Record, filed by MALCOLM B. BLANKENSHIP, III.Reply due by 7/24/2008. (Cassara, William)
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 6/12/2008, Entered: 6/12/2008
      ORDER granting [12] Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to [11] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's Response to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Due On or Before Thursday, July 31, 2008. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (es1)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008, Terminated: 6/12/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
        MOTION for Extension of Time until July 31, 2008 to, filed by MALCOLM B. BLANKENSHIP, III.Response due by 6/27/2008.(Cassara, William)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 5/16/2008, Entered: 5/16/2008
          MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) Or, In The Alternative For Judgment Upon the Administartive Record, filed by USA.Response due by 6/16/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Tab 1a of Administrative Record, # (2) Tab 1b of Administrative Record, # (3) Tab 1c of Administrative Record, # (4) 2a, # (5) 2b, # (6) Tab 2c, # (7) Tab 2d, # (8) Tab 2e, # (9) Tab 2f, # (10) Tab 3a, # (11) 3b, # (12) 3c)(Krafchek, Christopher)
          LREF
          Blank -- Filed: 5/8/2008, Entered: 5/8/2008
          ORDER granting [10] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer,Answer due by 5/16/2008. Signed by the Clerk. (mb2) Modified on 5/8/2008 to remove document number (mb2).
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/7/2008, Entered: 5/7/2008, Terminated: 5/8/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
            Second MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/16/2008 to File Answer re Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, filed by USA.Response due by 5/27/2008.(Krafchek, Christopher)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 3/20/2008, Entered: 3/20/2008
              ORDER granting [9] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.Answer due by 5/8/2008. Signed by the Clerk. (mb2)
                LREF
                Legal Document 9 Filed: 3/19/2008, Entered: 3/19/2008, Terminated: 3/20/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                First MOTION for Extension of Time until 5/8/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 4/7/2008.(Krafchek, Christopher)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 8 Filed: 3/6/2008, Entered: 3/6/2008 Court Filing
                  ORDER The parties are not requesting a meeting for early neutral evaluation. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 7 Filed: 2/25/2008, Entered: 2/25/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER Telephonic conference concerning scheduling of ADR proceedings will be held on 3/6/2008 at 2:30 p.m. Signed by Judge Bohdan A. Futey. (mp1)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 6 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008 Court Filing
                      SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER. Signed by Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (EJ1)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 5 Filed: 2/22/2008, Entered: 2/22/2008
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher Lonnie Krafchek for USA. (Krafchek, Christopher)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 4 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Notice of Assignment - Auto ADRCourt Filing
                          NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Bohdan A. Futey for Auto ADR proceedings. (mb2)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 3 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                            NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Judge Edward J. Damich. (mb2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 2 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                              NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 1/22/2008, Entered: 1/24/2008 Complaint
                                COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067603), filed by MALCOLM B. BLANKENSHIP, III. Answer due by 3/24/2008.(mb2)
                                  LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 214 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?