MYRICK v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00092-SGB
District Judge Susan G. Braden, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo SHARON L. MYRICK, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Wendell Carver Robinson +1 202 223 4470 +1 202 726 9060 grindstonelaw@aol.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Office COFC
Filed 2/14/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 352 - Military Pay - Retirement
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document 20 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
REPLY to Response to Motion re [16] Motion for Judgment on the Record, filed by SHARON L. MYRICK. (Robinson, Wendell)
    LREF
    Legal Document 19 Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/7/2008
    RESPONSE to [16] [Cross] Motion and REPLY to [17] Response to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, , filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A (Disability Evaluation Manual, chapters 1 to 4), # (2) Exhibit A (Disability Evaluation Manual, chapters 5 to 7), # (3) Exhibit A (Disability Evaluation Manual, chapters 8 to 9), # (4) Exhibit A (Disability Evaluation Manual, exhibits 1 and 2))(Edelschick, Douglas) Modified on 8/11/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 8/7/2008, Entered: 8/11/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
      Set/Reset Deadlines: Reply to [19] Response to [16] Cross motion due by 8/28/2008 (per court order). (dls)
        LREF
        Legal Document 18 Filed: 7/28/2008, Entered: 7/28/2008 Court Filing
        ORDER granting [15] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to defendant's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am)
          LREF
          Legal Document 17 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
          RESPONSE to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record (Reply due by 8/14/2008.), filed by SHARON L. MYRICK. (Robinson, Wendell) Modified on 7/29/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
            LREF
            Legal Document 16 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008
            [Cross] MOTION for Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by SHARON L. MYRICK. Response due by 8/14/2008 (per court order).(Robinson, Wendell) Modified on 7/29/2008 to edit docket text and correct response due date. (dls).
              LREF
              Legal Document 15 Filed: 7/24/2008, Entered: 7/24/2008, Terminated: 7/28/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Repl
              MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response or Reply, filed by SHARON L. MYRICK.Response due by 8/11/2008.(Robinson, Wendell)
                LREF
                Legal Document 14 Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record, filed by USA. Response due by 7/15/2008 (per court order).(Edelschick, Douglas) Modified on 6/24/2008 to edit response due date. (dls).
                  LREF
                  Blank -- Filed: 6/24/2008, Entered: 6/24/2008
                  Reset Deadline as to [14] MOTION for Summary Judgment on the Administrative Record. Response due by 7/15/2008. (dls)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 13 Filed: 6/11/2008, Entered: 6/11/2008
                    Notice of Filing ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (attached) filed by USA. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Dr. Williams, # (2) AR 1-48, # (3) AR 49-83, # (4) AR 84-128, # (5) AR 129-174)(Edelschick, Douglas) Modified on 6/14/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 12 Filed: 6/10/2008, Entered: 6/10/2008 Court Filing
                    ORDER granting [11] Motion for Scheduling Order. Administrative Record due 6/13/08. Defendant's Motion For Judgment Upon Administrative Record due by 7/7/2008, responses and replies due 21 days after the filing of opposing parties filings. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am) Modified on 6/10/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 11 Filed: 6/9/2008, Entered: 6/9/2008, Terminated: 6/10/2008 Motion to Amend Schedule
                      Unopposed MOTION for Scheduling Order Concerning Cross-Motions for Judgment Upon Administrative Record, filed by USA. Response due by 6/26/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas) Modified on 6/10/2008 to edit docket text. (dls).
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 10 Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/14/2008 Court Filing
                        ORDER granting [8] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am)
                          LREF
                          Blank -- Filed: 5/14/2008, Entered: 5/19/2008 Set/Reset Deadlines:
                          Set/Reset Deadlines: Answer due by 6/13/2008. (dls)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 9 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by SHARON L. MYRICK.. (Robinson, Wendell)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 8 Filed: 5/13/2008, Entered: 5/13/2008, Terminated: 5/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                              MOTION for Extension of Time until June 13, 2008 to Respond to Complaint or Amended Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 5/30/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document 7 Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008 Court Filing
                                ORDER granting [6] Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (am)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank -- Filed: 4/14/2008, Entered: 4/14/2008
                                  Reset Deadline: Answer to [1] Complaint due by 5/14/2008. (dls)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 4/11/2008, Entered: 4/11/2008, Terminated: 4/14/2008 Motion for Extension of Time
                                    MOTION for Extension of Time until May 14, 2008 to Respond To Complaint, filed by USA.Response due by 4/28/2008.(Edelschick, Douglas)
                                      LREF
                                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 3/10/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas Glenn Edelschick for USA. (Edelschick, Douglas)
                                        LREF
                                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 OrderCourt Filing
                                        SPECIAL PROCEDURES ORDER: Although designated as an electronic case in the court's case management/electronic case filing (CM/ECF) system, any filing in excess of 100 pages (inclusive of appendices/exhibits) will be filed in traditional, hard-copy form, and not in electronic form. The parties will make such filings in accordance with the requirements set forth in the Rules of the United States Court of Federal Claims. Signed by Judge Susan G. Braden. (hw1, ) Modified on 3/10/2008 to edit docket text.(Samler, Debbie).
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Notice of Designation of Electronic Case
                                          NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (hw1, )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Notice Of AssignmentCourt Filing
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Judge Susan G. Braden. (hw1, )
                                              LREF
                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 2/14/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT against USA (NAV) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067678), filed by SHARON L. MYRICK. Answer due by 4/14/2008. (hw1, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 193 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?