HEATH et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-vv-00086-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo GRANT HEATH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by NELSON LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael G. McLaren +1 901 762 0535 +1 901 762 0539 mmclaren@blackmclaw.com
No Logo QUINN HEATH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by NELSON LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael G. McLaren +1 901 762 0535 +1 901 762 0539 mmclaren@blackmclaw.com
No Logo SUSAN HEATH, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by NELSON LAW FIRM

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Michael G. McLaren +1 901 762 0535 +1 901 762 0539 mmclaren@blackmclaw.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Darryl R. Wishard +1 202 616 4357 +1 202 616 4310 darryl.wishard@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/13/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 485 - Injury - Hemophilus influenzae
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
Flag ECF
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/15/2008
ORDER granting [20] Motion for Extension of Time Medical records due by 10/14/2008. Status conference rescheduled for 10/22/08 at 1:00 P.M. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: 9/18/2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings:
    Set Deadlines/Hearings: Status Conference set for 10/22/2008 01:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/5/2008, Entered: 9/5/2008, Terminated: 9/15/2008 Motion for Extension of Time (Vaccine)
      MOTION for Extension of Time until OCTOBER 3, 2008 to TO FILE MEDICAL RECORDS AND AFFIDAVITS and STATUS REPORT, filed by GRANT HEATH, SUSAN HEATH, QUINN HEATH.Response due by 9/22/2008. (McLaren, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/2/2008, Entered: 9/2/2008
        ORDER granting [17] Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008
          NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit 3 - Affidavit of Susan Heath by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH. (Attachments: # (1) Table of Contents, # (2) Exhibit 3)(McLaren, Michael)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/20/2008, Entered: 8/20/2008, Terminated: 9/2/2008 Motion to Amend/Correct
            MOTION to Amend/Correct Caption of Case, filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH.Response due by 9/8/2008. (McLaren, Michael)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/23/2008, Entered: 7/23/2008
              ORDER granting Petitioner's [15] Motion to Strike [13] Status Report. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008, Terminated: 7/23/2008 Motion to Strike
                MOTION to Strike [13] Status Report OF JULY 10, 2008, filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH.Response due by 7/28/2008.(McLaren, Michael)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 7/11/2008, Entered: 7/11/2008
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Medical records are due from petitioner by 9/8/2008. A Status Conference is set for 9/18/2008 at 01:00 PM in Chambers (Telephonic) before Special Master Christian J. Moran. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (fs)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/10/2008, Entered: 7/10/2008
                    [STRUCK] STATUS REPORT of Petitioner, filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH. (McLaren, Michael) Modified on 7/25/2008 (tjk, ).
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008
                      STATUS REPORT and Motion for Extension, filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH. (McLaren, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008
                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner's Affidavit and Medical records due by 6/24/2008. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. fs)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/17/2008, Entered: 4/17/2008
                          STATUS REPORT, filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH. (McLaren, Michael)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                            STATUS REPORT ORDERStatus Report regarding medical records due by 4/16/2008 Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (Moran, Christian)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Blank -- Filed: 3/17/2008, Entered: 3/17/2008
                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Special Master Christian J. Moran : Status Conference to discuss status of medical records held on 03/17/08. (Moran, Christian)
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                                NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (tjk, )
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Blank 7 Filed: 3/12/2008, Entered: 3/12/2008
                                  ORDER: The undersigned designates this case as ECF pursuant to General Order No. 13. The Initial Status Conference set for 3/17/2008 12:00 PM before Special Master Christian J. Moran, the Special Masters Office will initiate the call. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 6 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 notice of filing
                                    NOTICE OF FILING Exhibit #2 [Affidavit of Grant Heath] by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH. Service: (Copy to DOJ)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 5 Filed: 3/5/2008, Entered: 3/10/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                      MOTION for leave to file electronically, filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH. Service: [Copy to DOJ}
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 4 Filed: 3/3/2008, Entered: 3/8/2008 Initial Order
                                        INITIAL ORDER. The parties shall contact the undersigned's law clerk to schedule the initial status conference call by 3/14/08. Signed by Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 3 Filed: 2/27/2008, Entered: 3/2/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl R. Wishard for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 2/27/08.(tjk, )
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 2 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Notice Of Assignment
                                            NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Christian J. Moran. (tjk, )
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 2/13/2008, Entered: 2/15/2008 Petition
                                              PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067669) [Vaccination date: 2/15/05][Filed with Exhibit #1], filed by QUINN HEATH, GRANT HEATH.Respondents Report due by 5/16/2008.(tjk, )
                                                LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 80 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?