AVANT et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-vv-00120-UNJ

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo DONALD TOBIN AVANT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Arthur Oxner +1 843 527 8020 +1 843 546 4111 oxhat@aol.com
No Logo ELLA GRIER AVANT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Arthur Oxner +1 843 527 8020 +1 843 546 4111 oxhat@aol.com
No Logo MARGARET MORGAN AVANT, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Harry Arthur Oxner +1 843 527 8020 +1 843 546 4111 oxhat@aol.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard Francis Topping, Jr. +1 202 305 1586 +1 202 305 4130 richard.topping@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 2/29/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 483 - Death - Other
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 300 Vaccine Injury Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Pending Status entitlement
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 7 Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/28/2008 DECISION of Special Master
DECISION Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (Neal, Alonzo)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/29/2008 Remark
    Remark. The Decision of the Special Master dated 4/22/08 was sent to Petitioner's counsel via Federal Express Priority Overnight Delivery on 4/22/08. Tracking no. 8651 8314 7981 (tjk, )
      LREF
      Blank -- Filed: 4/22/2008, Entered: 4/22/2008
      Minute Entry for proceeding held telephonically on 4/18/2008 held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : Status Conference held on 4/18/2008 to discuss filing statutory time frame requirement. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
        LREF
        Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
        MOTION TO CONVERT CASE TO ECF FILING, filed by DONALD TOBIN AVANT, MARGARET MORGAN AVANT, ELLA GRIER AVANT. Service: 4/14/08.Response due by 5/2/2008. (Neal, Alonzo)
          LREF
          Blank 5 Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Motion to Substitute Attorney (Consented)
          Consented MOTION to Substitute Attorney Harry A. Oxner in place of Pro Se, filed by DONALD TOBIN AVANT, MARGARET MORGAN AVANT, ELLA GRIER AVANT. Service: 4/14/08. (Neal, Alonzo)
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/21/2008 Add and Terminate Attorneys
            ***Attorney Harry Arthur Oxner for DONALD TOBIN AVANT and MARGARET MORGAN AVANT added. (Neal, Alonzo)
              LREF
              Blank -- Filed: 4/15/2008, Entered: 4/15/2008
              Minute Entry for proceeding held telephonically on 4/15/2008 held before Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz : Initial Status Conference held on 4/15/2008. Petitioner to talk with treating pediatrician and also work on gathering remaining medical records. [Total number of days of proceeding: 1]. Proceeding was not officially recorded. (For parties in the case only, click HERE for link to Court of Federal Claims web site forms page for information on ordering: certified transcript from reporter or certified transcript of proceeding from official digital recording.)(co)
                LREF
                Blank 4 Filed: 3/18/2008, Entered: 3/24/2008 Notice of Appearance/
                NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Francis Topping, Jr for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. Service: 3/18/08.(tjk, )
                  LREF
                  Blank 3 Filed: 3/11/2008, Entered: 3/16/2008 Order
                  ORDER re Petitioner shall confer with respondent and then contact the court by 3/31/08, to suggest three possible dates and times for the initial conference call. Signed by Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                    LREF
                    Blank 2 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Notice Of Assignment
                    NOTICE of Assignment to Chief Special Master Gary J. Golkiewicz. (tjk, )
                      LREF
                      Blank 1 Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: 3/3/2008 Petition
                      PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067733) [Vaccination date: 2/28/05](Filed with Exhibits #1-11), filed by DONALD TOBIN AVANT, MARGARET MORGAN AVANT, GRIER AVANT.Respondents Report due by 6/2/2008.(tjk, )
                        LREF

                        Statistics

                        This case has been viewed 108 times.

                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                        Space
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                         
                        PlainSite
                        Sign Up
                        Need Password Help?