ALABAMA POWER COMPANY et al v. USA
Federal Civil Lawsuit United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:08-cv-00237-JFM
District Judge James F. Merow, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alabama Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Georgia Power Company, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
No Logo Southern Nuclear Operating Company, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Balch & Bingham LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Melvin Stanford Blanton +1 205 226 3417 +1 205 488 5879 sblanton@balch.com
v.
United States of America United States of America, Defendant
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marian Elizabeth Sullivan +1 202 307 0365 +1 202 307 2503 marian.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Office COFC
Filed 4/3/2008
Jury Demand None
Demand
Nature of Suit 536 - Spent Nuclear Fuel
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1491 Tucker Act
Jurisdiction U.S. Government Defendant
Disposition
County None
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flag ECF
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 98 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
**UNSEALED** ORDER (ECF No. 97 originally filed on June 6, 2013) denying 93 Defendant's Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Expert Report. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae) Copy to parties.
    LREF
    Legal Document 14 Filed: 9/8/2008, Entered: 9/8/2008
    RESPONSE to [13] MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..Reply due by 9/22/2008. (Blanton, Melvin)
      LREF
      Legal Document 13 Filed: 8/21/2008, Entered: 8/21/2008
      MOTION To Coordinate Discovery And Develop A Litigation Plan For The Spent Nuclear Fuel Cases, filed by USA.Response due by 9/8/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
        LREF
        Legal Document 12 Filed: 8/18/2008, Entered: 8/18/2008
        REPLY to Response to Motion re [10] MOTION to Stay case, filed by USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
          LREF
          Legal Document 11 Filed: 8/4/2008, Entered: 8/4/2008
          RESPONSE to [10] MOTION to Stay case, filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC..Reply due by 8/18/2008. (Blanton, Melvin)
            LREF
            Legal Document 10 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
            MOTION to Stay case, filed by USA.Response due by 8/4/2008.(Sullivan, Marian)
              LREF
              Legal Document 9 Filed: 7/17/2008, Entered: 7/17/2008
              NOTICE of Appearance by Marian Elizabeth Sullivan for USA. (Sullivan, Marian)
                LREF
                Legal Document 8 Filed: 6/23/2008, Entered: 6/23/2008 Court Filing
                ORDER granting [7] Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answer due by 7/17/2008. Signed by Senior Judge James F. Merow. (lae)
                  LREF
                  Legal Document 7 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008, Terminated: 6/23/2008 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer
                  First MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/17/2008 to File Answer re [1] Complaint,, filed by USA.Response due by 6/20/2008.(Lester, Harold)
                    LREF
                    Legal Document 6 Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: 6/3/2008
                    NOTICE of Appearance by Harold Dewitt Lester, Jr for USA. (Lester, Harold)
                      LREF
                      Legal Document 5 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008 Court Filing
                      NOTICE of Assignment to Judge James F. Merow. (mb2)
                        LREF
                        Legal Document 4 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                        NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (mb2)
                          LREF
                          Legal Document 3 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                          NOTICE of Directly Related Case(s) [98-614], filed by all plaintiffs. (mb2)
                            LREF
                            Legal Document 2 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                            Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, filed by all plaintiffs. (mb2)
                              LREF
                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/3/2008, Entered: 4/3/2008
                              COMPLAINT against USA (DOE) ( Filing fee $250, Receipt number 067920), filed by ALABAMA POWER COMPANY, GEORGIA POWER COMPANY, SOUTHERN NUCLEAR OPERATING COMPANY, INC. Answer due by 6/2/2008. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix # (2) Appendix # (3) Appendix # (4) Appendix)(mb2)
                              LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 309 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?